Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 01:52:00 (UTC).

MARK DUBOVOY vs. CREATIVE HABITAT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 MARK DUBOVOY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CREATIVE HABITAT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L., Scott, Joseph C., KARESH, Fineman, Nancy L., Grandsaert, John L, Scott, Joseph C, Halperin, Ernst A, Fineman, Nancy L and Fineman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1355

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L.

Scott, Joseph C.

Fineman, Nancy L.

Grandsaert, John L

Scott, Joseph C

Halperin, Ernst A

Fineman, Nancy L

Not Yet Classifieds

KARESH

Fineman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUBOVOY, MARK

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

CREATIVE HABITAT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MCR Construction LLC

A & B Heating and Air Conditioning

CREATIVE HABITAT, INC

E & S GRANITE & TILE INSTALLATION

R.W. BICKERSON CONSTRUCTION

ROES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

Bay Hydronic, Inc.

RJ Leonard Painting

M.G. CONCRETE COMPANY, INC

BEST-THE BEST CABINETS

GATOR TECH INTERGRATION, ONC.

GATOR TECH INTERGRATION, INC.

MOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1 THROUGH 25

A&B AIR CONDITIONING

ZOES 1 TO 50

RW Bickford Construction

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENGARELLI, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

ACREE, MARISSA N.

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GUNN, BRIAN H

LEOW, JEFFREY A.

SCHONEMAN, TINA L.

FINCH, ALBERT M., III

VILLARREAL, REGINALDO, JR

Other Attorneys

WELCH, STEPHEN B.

SCHROEDER, EDWARD C., JR

WALSH, PAUL B.

PEZOLD, DANIEL G

WHITIS, GAVIN D

SHERWOOD, LAURIE E

LYNCH, JACK D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/11/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NANCY HENDRICKS- DEPUTY SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; COVER SHEET; NO Comment NANCY HENDRICKS- DEPUTY SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CMC; ORDER FOR SERVICE ON SECRETARY OF STATE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPALINT; ORDER FOR SERVICE ON SECRETARY OF STATE Comment SUMMONS; COMPALINT; ORDER FOR SERVICE ON SECRETARY OF STATE

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration.

Declaration CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Comment CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Answer.

Answer to CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREATIVE HABITAT INC Comment to CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREATIVE HABITAT, INC

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

CMC Stmt 06.11.21.pdf

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF A Comment MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF A&B HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER [C.C.P. 877.6 (a) (2) RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER [C.C.P. 877.6 (a) (2) RE: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY GATOR TECH INTERGRATION FWD: TO DEPT. 4

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint NAMING DOE/ROE ROE 7 as ALFONSO LOPEZ DBA ARTISAN LATH & PLASTERNAMING DOE/R Comment NAMING DOE/ROE ROE 7 as ALFONSO LOPEZ DBA ARTISAN LATH & PLASTER NAMING DOE/ROE ROE 8 as GILBERT RODRIGUEZ DBA BEST OF THE BEST CUSTOM CABINETS

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT served on SEE SERVICE LIST

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 07/01/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: MENGARELLI, MICHAELDefendantAttorney: ACREE, MARISSA N.Cross DefendantAttorney: WELCH, STEPHEN B.Cross ComplainantAttorney: ACREE, MARISSA N.Cross DefendantAttorney: LYNCH, JACK D.Cross DefendantAttorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L.Attorney: SCHONEMAN, TINA L.Cross DefendantAttorney: LYNCH, JACK D.IntervenorAttorney: WELCH, STEPHEN B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name. Additional Info: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Counsel / Attorney. Additional Info: Association of Counsel / Attorney Attorney: MATTHEW S COLE of WFBM LLP hereby associates withAttor Comment Attorney: MATTHEW S COLE of WFBM, LLP hereby associates with Attorney: BUSTAMANTE & GAGLIASSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for R.W. BICKERSON CONSTRUCTION : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-024760-HOJ R.W. BICKERSON CONSTRUCTION $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for R.W. BICKERSON CONSTRUCTION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Cross-Complaint File Date 06/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint. Additional Info: Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
205 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for DUBOVOY, MARK : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-014557-HOJ MENGARELLI, MICHAEL $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for DUBOVOY, MARK : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: DUBOVOY, MARK; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration. Additional Info: Declaration CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Comment CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M.G. CONCRETE COMPANY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GATOR TECH INTERGRATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MCR Construction is a litigant