Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 21:12:02 (UTC).

MARIELA ADELINE TOKILLAS vs. LUIS DANIEL TOKILLAS

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 MARIELA ADELINE TOKILLAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUIS DANIEL TOKILLAS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dabel, Sean P. and Dabel, Sean P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1693

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dabel, Sean P.

Dabel, Sean P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOKILLAS, MARIELA ADELINE

Respondent

TOKILLAS, LUIS DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Status Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation & Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketJudgment Received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDefault Received..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure and Income & Expense Declaration filed. Service Date: 03/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal. Additional Info: Comment Separation

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TOKILLAS, MARIELA ADELINE : Case Payment Receipt # 2020-036250-HOJ TOKILLAS, MARIELA ADELINE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for TOKILLAS, MARIELA ADELINE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: TOKILLAS, MARIELA ADELINE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution with Minor Child File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA. Additional Info: Comment Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction & Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less