This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 17:52:08 (UTC).

Maria Socorro Aguilar vs. Julio Kluss, et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Maria Socorro Aguilar filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Julio Kluss,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5275

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aguilar, Maria Socorro

Defendants

Kluss, Julio

Julio Kluss Sole Proprietor

THE EMPANADAS KING;

DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLETTER, CARY S.

Defendant Attorney

HENSHAW, DAVID S.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) General Denial Comment General Denial

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of GENERAL DENIAL Comment GENERAL DENIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kluss, Julio; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-003396-HOJ Kluss, Julio $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Kluss, Julio; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; Kluss, Julio; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of GENERAL DENIAL Comment GENERAL DENIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) General Denial Comment General Denial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Aguilar, Maria Socorro; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-045109-HOJ Aguilar, Maria Socorro $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Aguilar, Maria Socorro; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Aguilar, Maria Socorro; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less