This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 00:06:04 (UTC).

MARIA RUTENBURG vs. TWITTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 MARIA RUTENBURG filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TWITTER, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FINEMAN and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3722

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

FINEMAN

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUTENBURG, MARIA

Defendant

TWITTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAVITCH, MARK L.

Defendant Attorney

CONRAD, MARK R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re New Hearing Date re Defendant Twitter Inc.'s Demurrer and Request for Judicial Comment New Hearing Date re Defendant Twitter, Inc.'s Demurrer and Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DEFENDANT TWITTER INC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; ETC... Comment DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; ETC...

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received RE: SUSTAINING DEFENDANT TWITTER INC.'S DEMURRER Comment RE: SUSTAINING DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC.'S DEMURRER

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TWITTER INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF MARK R. CONRAD TO DEFENDANT TWITTER INC.'S DEMURRER Comment OF MARK R. CONRAD TO DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC.'S DEMURRER

Demurrer to.

Demurrer to SINGLE CAUSE OF ACTION ASSERTED BY PLAINTIFF MARIA RUTENBURG Comment SINGLE CAUSE OF ACTION ASSERTED BY PLAINTIFF MARIA RUTENBURG

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED- GENERAL CIVIL SENT TO DEPT. 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPO Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Comment DEPT. 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice.

Notice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS Comment CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Notice.

Notice CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS Comment CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Stipulation.

Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Comment EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC... Comment NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC...

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN MO Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN MONTIJO AUTHORIZED AGENT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re New Hearing Date re Defendant Twitter Inc.'s Demurrer and Request for Judicial Comment New Hearing Date re Defendant Twitter, Inc.'s Demurrer and Request for Judicial Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TWITTER, INC. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-037164-HOJ TWITTER, INC. $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for TWITTER, INC. : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of. Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DEFENDANT TWITTER INC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; ETC... Comment DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received RE: SUSTAINING DEFENDANT TWITTER INC.'S DEMURRER Comment RE: SUSTAINING DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC.'S DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice. Additional Info: Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TWITTER INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support. Additional Info: Declaration in Support OF MARK R. CONRAD TO DEFENDANT TWITTER INC.'S DEMURRER Comment OF MARK R. CONRAD TO DEFENDANT TWITTER, INC.'S DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to. Additional Info: Demurrer to SINGLE CAUSE OF ACTION ASSERTED BY PLAINTIFF MARIA RUTENBURG Comment SINGLE CAUSE OF ACTION ASSERTED BY PLAINTIFF MARIA RUTENBURG

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN MO Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on JOHN MONTIJO AUTHORIZED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for RUTENBURG, MARIA : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027651-HOJ RUTENBURG, MARIA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for RUTENBURG, MARIA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: RUTENBURG, MARIA; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWITTER, INC. is a litigant