This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:55 (UTC).

MARC BESESIS DE ROTROU AND JENNIFER BENESIS DE ROT

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 MARC BESESIS DE ROTROU AND JENNIFER BENESIS DE ROT was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V Raymond and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8185

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V Raymond

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI

Respondent

BENESIS DE ROTROU, JENNIFER ENGLERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: BENESIS DE ROTROU JENNIFER ENGLERT; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JMTF: (FL) JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION (MSE: 12/15/14) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ASW1: APPEARANCE STIPULATION AND WAIVERS (RESPONSE ALREADY FILED) FILED BY JENNIFER ENGLERT BENESIS DE ROTROU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: FILE FORWARDED TO CLERK'S OFFICE FOR SCANNING OF FOAH FILED ON 05/30/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: FILE WITH FLF FOR SCANNING FOAH FILED ON 05/30/14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: COPIES OF FOAH FILED ON 05/30/14 MAILED TO PARTIES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • Findings and Order After Hearing. Additional Info: Comment FOAH: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING 04/28/14 FILED BY PREPARED BY FLF, SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE, ON 05/27/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2013
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, JENNIFER ENGLERT : Case Payment Receipt # 201312270171 BENESIS DE ROTROU, JENNIFER ENGLERT $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, JENNIFER ENGLERT : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Financial: BENESIS DE ROTROU, JENNIFER ENGLERT; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI : Case Payment Receipt # 201401130596 BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI : Case Payment Receipt # 201401130592 BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260403 BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: BENESIS DE ROTROU, MARC HENRI; Total Financial Assessment $485.00; Total Payments and Credits $485.00

    Read MoreRead Less