This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:00:51 (UTC).

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION VS MARTIN HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARTIN HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5846

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

OF HSBC

Defendants

MARTIN HERNANDEZ

HERNANDEZ, MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOULANGER, MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AS TO MARTIN HERNANDEZ BY SUB-SERVING MARTIN HERNANDEZ SENIOR, FATHER. MAILING DATE OF 09/03/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: CONDITIONAL STIPULATED SETTLEMENT FILED.

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 SIGNED BY BF ON 02/22/13 FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: HERNANDEZ MARTIN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130227-0409-CK 037/ 20.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP4: MOTION FEE PAID BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130227-0407-CK 173/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY MARTIN HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order. Additional Info: ORDER Comment O2: ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RETAINING JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 SIGNED BY BF ON 02/22/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: CONDITIONAL STIPULATED SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: NOTE - ONLY ONE ORD/STIP DISMISSING FILED ON 2/27/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment SODA: STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP SIGNED BY BF ON 02/22/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AS TO MARTIN HERNANDEZ BY SUB-SERVING MARTIN HERNANDEZ SENIOR, FATHER. MAILING DATE OF 09/03/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120807-0321-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Financial info for HERNANDEZ, MARTIN : Case Payment Receipt # 201302270407 HERNANDEZ, MARTIN $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Financial info for HERNANDEZ, MARTIN : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Financial: HERNANDEZ, MARTIN; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Case Payment Receipt # 201302270409 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Case Payment Receipt # 201208070321 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Total Financial Assessment $245.00; Total Payments and Credits $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less