This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:00:59 (UTC).

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION VS FERNANDO SALGADO

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FERNANDO SALGADO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5843

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

OF HSBC

Defendants

FERNANDO SALGADO

SALGADO, FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOULANGER, MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AS TO FERNANDO SALGADO.

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS (6) Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $218.30, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION WAIVER OF INTEREST & ATTORNEY'S FEES DECLARATION

Conversion Action.

WRIT (2) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM CONTRA COSTA COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Document.

FILING (24) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585)

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AS TO FERNANDO SALGADO BY SUB-SERVING REBECCA RIVERS. MAILING DATE OF 08/26/12.

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 12/18/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS (C.C.P. 1033)

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit Comment and declaration of accrued interest 921.06, COSTS: 24.10.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $46.62, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Awarded Against: SALGADO FERNANDO; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/18/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP FOR MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST FERNANDO SALGADO PRINCIPAL IS $2,397.71. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $287.50. TOTAL JUDGMENT $2,685.21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 5-31-17 Amount: 3655.37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit Comment and declaration of accrued interest 921.06, COSTS: 24.10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (24) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (2) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM CONTRA COSTA COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 141107-0413-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2928.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120807-0343-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Case Payment Receipt # 201208070343 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less