This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:01:04 (UTC).

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP VS BERTA S CROWE

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BERTA S CROWE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5842

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

OF HSBC

Defendants

BERTA S CROWE

CROWE, BERTA S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOULANGER, MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $22.40, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP SERVED ON BERTA S CROWE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/02/12.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF COSTS (C.C.P. 1033)

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: WAIVER OF INTEREST & ATTORNEY'S FEES DECLARATION FILED.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 12/18/13 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585)

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment 2ND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MICHA Comment 2ND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MICHAEL K. SIPES ESQ

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING (18) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP AS TO BERTA S CROWE.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Awarded Against: CROWE BERTA S; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/18/13 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP FOR MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BERTA S CROWE PRINCIPAL IS $985.91. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $287.50. TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,273.41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment 2ND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MICHA Comment 2ND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY MICHAEL K. SIPES ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (18) Comment FILED: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $22.40, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140304-0943-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1320.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $1273.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $287.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION RE VENUE FILED BY MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120807-0351-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Case Payment Receipt # 201208070351 MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial info for MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • Financial: MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less