This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/12/2023 at 11:39:46 (UTC).

MACROMATOR INC vs. GENESYS CLOUD SERVICES, INC.,, et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 MACROMATOR INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENESYS CLOUD SERVICES, INC ,,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mau, Michael L and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0833

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mau, Michael L

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Macromator Inc

Defendants

GENESYS CLOUD SERVICES, INC.,

GENESYS TELECOMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES, INC.

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEMIS, GARY A

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE NAME OF PARTY SERVED DOES Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE, NAME OF PARTY SERVED DOES NOT MATCH THE COMPLAINT

Notice.

Notice NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT Comment NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; MACROMATOR INC; GENESYS CLOUD SERVICES, INC.,; DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice, ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT Comment NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE NAME OF PARTY SERVED DOES Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE, NAME OF PARTY SERVED DOES NOT MATCH THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for MACROMATOR INC; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-006182-HOJ Macromator Inc $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for MACROMATOR INC; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; MACROMATOR INC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less