Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:41:47 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. JAMAL STARNES, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMAL STARNES. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2798

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendants

STARNES, JAMAL

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK, BROOKE

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DECLARATION OF V Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DECLARATION OF VENUE, DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Declaration in support of reduced filing fee.

Declaration in support of reduced filing fee

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION.); Party; Names: LVNV FUNDING LLC; STARNES JAMAL; DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DECLARATION OF V Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, DECLARATION OF VENUE, DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue. Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in support of reduced filing fee. Additional Info: Declaration in support of reduced filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Financial info for LVNV FUNDING LLC : Fine Suspension $44.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Financial info for LVNV FUNDING LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037548-HOJ PARK, BROOKE $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for LVNV FUNDING LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less