This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 00:17:17 (UTC).

LUIS R. CHAVARRIA RAMIREZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED vs PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES CORPORATION, a Nevada corporation

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 LUIS R CHAVARRIA RAMIREZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES CORPORATION, a Nevada corporation. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FINEMAN, Fineman, Nancy L and YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3392

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fineman, Nancy L

Not Yet Classifieds

FINEMAN

YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS R. CHAVARRIA RAMIREZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES CORPORATION, a Nevada corporation

PROSPECT AIRPORT SERVICES, INC., an unknown business entity

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AIWAZIAN, EDWIN

COTTRELL, CAROLYN HUNT

Defendant Attorney

GELLER, JASON A

 

Court Documents

Order.

Order Comment Type: GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT. Signed by: JUDGE YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS Date Signed: 11/3/2021

Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Clerk's Notice of Hearing

Remand From District/Federal Court's Civil Docket.

Remand From District/Federal Court's Civil Docket

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case

Association of Counsel / Attorney.

Association of Counsel / Attorney Attorney: EDWIN AIWAZIAN hereby associates withAttorney: CAROLYN Comment Attorney: EDWIN AIWAZIAN hereby associates with Attorney: CAROLYN HUNT COTTRELL ESQ

Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand.

Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand Comment from District Court

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 ISSUED BY JUDGE FINEMAN Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 ISSUED BY JUDGE FINEMAN

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order NO. 1 ISSUED BY JUDGE FINEMAN Comment NO. 1 ISSUED BY JUDGE FINEMAN

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINTDEFENDANTS PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES INC.'S A Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

Joint Brief.

Joint Brief JOINT SUBMISSION RE CONSOLIDATION Comment JOINT SUBMISSION RE CONSOLIDATION

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Original Type Case Management and Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 02/08/2022 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM Result Held

Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee).

Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee) AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAI Comment AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES CORPORATION AN Comment Type: TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES CORPORATION AND PROSPECT AIRPORT SERVICES INC. S LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT; Signed by: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 1/28/2022

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement JOINT Comment JOINT

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment ESTHER BYLSMA - ATTY ANDREW SAYON - ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Complex Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Attorney.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Brief.; Additional Info: Joint Brief JOINT SUBMISSION RE CONSOLIDATION Comment JOINT SUBMISSION RE CONSOLIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PROSPECT AIRPORT SERVICES, INC., an unknown business entity; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-005010-HOJ PROSPECT AIRPORT SERVICES, INC., an unknown business entity $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for PROSPECT AIRPORT SERVICES, INC., an unknown business entity; Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees.; Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINTDEFENDANTS PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES INC.'S A Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANTS PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for LUIS R. CHAVARRIA RAMIREZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-024796-HOJ RAMIREZ, LUIS R. CHAVARRIA $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for LUIS R. CHAVARRIA RAMIREZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED; Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; LUIS R. CHAVARRIA RAMIREZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC SIMILARLY SITUATED; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROSPECT INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT SERVICES CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELLER, JASON A