This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 21:39:54 (UTC).

LOGIGEAR VS D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS

Case Summary

On 11/16/2010 LOGIGEAR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L, RUNDE, JOHN WINFIELD, Bergeron, Joseph E, FREEMAN, BETH, Buchwald, Gerald J, Buchwald, Gerald J. and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0616

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

RUNDE, JOHN WINFIELD

Bergeron, Joseph E

FREEMAN, BETH

Buchwald, Gerald J

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOGIGEAR CORPORATION

Defendant

D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEVERSON, LAWRENCE L, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

SKAGGS, JASON M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF LOGIGEAR CORPORATION FILED BY D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS REPRESENTE Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF LOGIGEAR CORPORATION FILED BY D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, REPRESENTED BY JASON M. SKAGGS

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: LOGIGEAR CORPORATION; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment NEDPS: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LOGIGEAR CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Affidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Comment AFM: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING OF NOTICE OF HRG RE OSC FOR DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Document. Additional Info: Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING RE OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 111115-0724-CK 022/ 366.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CRFEE: COURT REPORTER FEES OF $366.00 PAID BY LOGIGEAR CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 111115-0720-CK 022/ 366.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
349 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2010
  • Financial info for D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS : Case Payment Receipt # 201012220451 D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • Financial info for D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2010
  • Financial: D3 SECURITY MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS; Total Financial Assessment $1,261.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,261.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Financial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201111150724 LOGIGEAR CORPORATION $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Financial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Financial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201107140497 LOGIGEAR CORPORATION $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Financial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Financial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 201011160366 LOGIGEAR CORPORATION $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Financial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2010
  • Financial: LOGIGEAR CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $801.00; Total Payments and Credits $801.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LogiGear Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKAGGS, JASON M.