This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/04/2022 at 02:15:11 (UTC).

LOGIGEAR CORPORATION, a California corporation, et al vs. SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 LOGIGEAR CORPORATION, a California corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FINEMAN, DuBois, Richard H, Greenberg, Susan, Fineman, Nancy L., Grandsaert, John L., DuBois, Richard H., Scott, Joseph C., Scott, Joseph C, Swope, V. Raymond, Fineman, Nancy L, SWOPE and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7558

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

FINEMAN

DuBois, Richard H

Greenberg, Susan

Fineman, Nancy L.

Grandsaert, John L.

DuBois, Richard H.

Scott, Joseph C.

Scott, Joseph C

Swope, V. Raymond

Fineman, Nancy L

SWOPE

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

LogiGear Corporation

LOGIGEAR CORPORATION, a California corporation

DOES 1 - 10, INCLUSIVE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Symphony Communication Services, LLC

FPT USA CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

SHMIDT, DENIS

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

JENNINGS, NOAH

BULUT, KORAY J.

HEWITT, ANTOINETTE P

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/14/2021 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: SHMIDT, DENISDefendantAttorney: BULUT, KORAY J.DefendantAttorney: HEWITT, ANTOINETTE P

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST Comment CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST

Case Management Statement.

LogiGear v Symphony CMC Statement 4-20-21.pdf

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SYMPHON Comment IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICES' FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Hearing on Demurrer.

Original Type Hearing on Demurrer Hearing on Demurrer 10/07/2020 ~CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Comment TO SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICES, LLC'S FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling.

Notice of Ruling re FPT's Demurrer.pdf Comment RE DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer.

Answer LOGIGEAR CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICE LLC'S UNVERIFIED SECOND AMEND Comment LOGIGEAR CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICE LLC'S UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Jury Trial.

Notice of Jury Trial 11/29/2022 at 9 AM Comment 11/29/2022 at 9 AM

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing - Order for Civil Trials (Pretrial Order) Comment - Order for Civil Trials (Pretrial Order)

Order.

Order For Civil Trials (Pretrial Order) Comment For Civil Trials (Pretrial Order)

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/21/2022 at 9 AM Comment 10/21/2022 at 9 AM

Case Management and Trial Setting Conference.

Original Type Case Management and Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 03/18/2022 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Comment CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

193 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment 11/29-12/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer(s) Mandatory Settlement Conferences -, Fineman, Nancy L., Chou, Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Trial.; Additional Info: Notice of Jury Trial 11/29/2022 at 9 AM Comment 11/29/2022 at 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing - Order for Civil Trials (Pretrial Order) Comment - Order for Civil Trials (Pretrial Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order For Civil Trials (Pretrial Order) Comment For Civil Trials (Pretrial Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/21/2022 at 9 AM Comment 10/21/2022 at 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management and Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management and Trial Setting Conference 03/18/2022 Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.; Additional Info: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICES LLC - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIV Comment SYMPHONY COMMUNICATION SERVICES, LLC - SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC 04/22/2020, BLANK COPY OF JUDICIAL COUNCIL CASE MAMAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION, a California corporation; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2019-077118-HOJ LogiGear Corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for LOGIGEAR CORPORATION, a California corporation; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; LOGIGEAR CORPORATION, a California corporation; Total Financial Assessment $1,095.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,095.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LogiGear Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHMIDT DENIS