This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 00:05:45 (UTC).

LOBISS N. PARKS, JR vs. MICHAEL LAWRENCE BROWN

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 LOBISS N PARKS, JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL LAWRENCE BROWN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0848

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKS, LOBISS N., JR

Defendant

BROWN, MICHAEL LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL.

Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by MICHAEL BROWNHearing Date 01/08/2021 Comment Signed for by MICHAEL BROWN Hearing Date 01/08/2021

Fee Waiver Granted.

Fee Waiver Granted Signed by PEKINA TAGALOA on 09/16/2020 Comment Signed by PEKINA TAGALOA on 09/16/2020

Plaintiff's Claim.

Plaintiff's Claim

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim.

Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Small Claims - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19. Additional Info: Notice of Rescheduled Hearing - Covid-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION Comment SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - CHANGE IN LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL. Additional Info: Proof of Service by CERTIFIED MAIL Signed for by MICHAEL BROWNHearing Date 01/08/2021 Comment Signed for by MICHAEL BROWN Hearing Date 01/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for PARKS, LOBISS N., JR : Fee Waiver $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for PARKS, LOBISS N., JR : Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for PARKS, LOBISS N., JR : Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: PARKS, LOBISS N., JR; Total Financial Assessment $90.00; Total Payments and Credits $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Plaintiff's Claim File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted. Additional Info: Fee Waiver Granted Signed by PEKINA TAGALOA on 09/16/2020 Comment Signed by PEKINA TAGALOA on 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim. Additional Info: Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less