This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:16:18 (UTC).

LEROY INVESTMENT LTD VS JUANA BUENTOSTRO

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 LEROY INVESTMENT LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JUANA BUENTOSTRO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borja, Hugo R and Borja, Hugo R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6198

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borja, Hugo R

Borja, Hugo R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEROY INVESTMENT LTD

Defendants

GONZALEZ, RAYMUNDO SILVA

BUENROSTRO, JUANA

GONZALEZ, REUMUNDO SILVA

ARELLANO, ALMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSPM: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD AS TO REUMUNDO SILVA GONZALEZ FILED SHOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING. DATE OF MAILING: 07/21/12.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (3) Comment PSPM: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD AS TO JUANA BUENROSTRO FILED SHOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING. DATE OF MAILING: 07/21/12.

Document.

FILING (3) Comment FILED: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY RETURNED FROM SM CO. AS PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED.

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT (2) Comment AJU: AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED

Conversion Action.

APPLICATION Comment APL: APPLICATION FOR POSTING & MAILING FILED BY LEROY INVESTMENT LTD

Order.

ORDER Comment O: ORDER FOR POSTING & MAILING SIGNED BY JUDGE SWOPE ON 07/18/12, FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DLT: DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY FILED BY LEROY INVESTMENT LTD

Amended Request for Entry of Default.

FILING (2) Comment ARD: AMENDED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO JUANA BUENROSTRO RAYMUNDO SILVA GONZALEZ, ALMA ARELLANO FILED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: POS OF ALL OCCUPANTS SERVED BY POSTING AND MAILING ON 07/21/12 FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD FILED

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD AS TO JUANA BUENROSTRO REUMUNDO SILVA GONZALEZ, ALMA ARELLANO.

Conversion Action.

ORDER (2) Comment ODCE1: ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. CERTIFIED COPY FORWARDED TO LEVYING OFFICER OF SAN MATEO COUNTY. COPIES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

Conversion Action.

WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Amendment to complaint filed.

COMPLAINT (2) Comment ATCCN: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD FILED; TRUE NAME OF RAYMUNDO SILVA GONZALEZ CHANGED FROM REUMUNDO SILVA GONZALEZ.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (4) Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SERVED ON ALMA ARGLLANO WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 12/05/12 FILED.

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: LEROY INVESTMENT LTD; Awarded Against: BUENROSTRO JUANA; GONZALEZ, RAYMUNDO SILVA; ARELLANO, ALMA; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 09/18/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD FOR LEROY INVESTMENT LTD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD AGAINST JUANA BUENROSTRO, RAYMUNDO SILVA GONZALEZ, ALMA ARELLANO PRINCIPAL IS $2,200.00. DAMAGES ARE $3,519.80. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $500.00. COSTS ARE $543.50. TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,763.30 JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 151 WISTERIA DRIVE EAST PALO ALTO CA. 94303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT (3) Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SANTA CLARA COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (3) Comment FILED: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY RETURNED FROM SM CO. AS PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: ACKNOWLEDGMENT Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF LEROY INVESTMENT LTD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: ORDER (2) Comment ODCE1: ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. CERTIFIED COPY FORWARDED TO LEVYING OFFICER OF SAN MATEO COUNTY. COPIES MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY IRMA ON 01/09/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: THE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment FFT: THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY EARNINGS TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CEXD: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY JUANA BUENROSTRO RAYMUNDO SILVA GONZALEZ, ALMA ARELLANO DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYPPB: LEROY INVESTMENT LTD PRESENT IN PRO PER REPRESENTED BY PONGESRI LU (SEC).

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 151 WISTERIA DRIVE EAST PALO ALTO CA94303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • Financial info for LEROY INVESTMENT LTD : Case Payment Receipt # 201212050392 LEROY INVESTMENT LTD $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • Financial info for LEROY INVESTMENT LTD : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • Financial info for LEROY INVESTMENT LTD : Case Payment Receipt # 201209190087 LEROY INVESTMENT LTD $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Financial info for LEROY INVESTMENT LTD : Case Payment Receipt # 201207190022 LEROY INVESTMENT LTD $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Financial info for LEROY INVESTMENT LTD : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for LEROY INVESTMENT LTD : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270032 LEROY INVESTMENT LTD $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for LEROY INVESTMENT LTD : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: LEROY INVESTMENT LTD; Total Financial Assessment $340.00; Total Payments and Credits $340.00

    Read MoreRead Less