Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 22:57:45 (UTC).

Lendmark Financial Services, LLC, a limited liability company, et al vs. Nenita Ocfemio, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Lendmark Financial Services, LLC, a limited liability company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nenita Ocfemio. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3964

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lendmark Financial Services, LLC, a limited liability company

Defendants

Ocfemio, Nenita

DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACLEOD, JAMES

Defendant Attorney

BUTLER, DAVID A., JR

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of GENERAL DENIAL Comment GENERAL DENIAL

Answer (Limited up to $10000).

Answer (Limited up to $10000) General Denial TO COMPLAINT Comment General Denial TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Declaration of Venue.

Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ocfemio, Nenita : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-041672-HOJ Ocfemio, Nenita $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ocfemio, Nenita : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Ocfemio, Nenita; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of GENERAL DENIAL Comment GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Limited up to $10000). Additional Info: Answer (Limited up to $10000) General Denial TO COMPLAINT Comment General Denial TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lendmark Financial Services, LLC, a limited liability company : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036275-HOJ Lendmark Financial Services, LLC, a limited liability company $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lendmark Financial Services, LLC, a limited liability company : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Lendmark Financial Services, LLC, a limited liability company; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue. Additional Info: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Macleod, James