This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:08:07 (UTC).

LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION vs. FOREST ELLIOTT, et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2018 LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FOREST ELLIOTT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3856

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Defendants, Plaintiffs, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ELLIOTT, FOREST

LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SPARKLE BRITE COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

SPARKLE BRITE CO

LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. INC

FLEETWOOD WINDOWS & DOORS

FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS,INC

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

MOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

MURRAY WINDOW & DOOR, INC.

MURRAY WINDOW & DOOR, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEENEY, JOSEPH M.

BOSOMWORTH, BRADLEY D

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ACREE, MARISSA N.

RHODES, BRIAN W.

SWEENEY, JOSEPH M.

KAIMAN, BARRY G

KEPKO, JONATHAN G

SHEA, JAMES

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR SESSION DATE: 10/8 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Comment SESSION DATE: 10/8

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 6/27 Comment CMC 6/27

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 4/25 Comment CMC 4/25

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 4/25 Comment CMC 4/25

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO FOREST ELLIOT CROSS-COMPLAINT by FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS INC erron Comment Answer TO FOREST ELLIOT CROSS-COMPLAINT by FLEETWOOD ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC erroneously sued and served as FLEETWOOD WINDOWS & DOORS (ROE 1)

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference.

Case Management Conference 01/24/2019 *CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

Order.

Order Type: ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT DWAYNE NASH INDUSTRIES IN Comment Type: ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT DWAYNE NASH INDUSTRIES, INC DBA KODIAK ROOFING & WATERPROOFING CO. Signed by: RAYMOND SWOPE Date Signed: 05/31/19

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 4/25 Comment CMC 4/25

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/28/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Amendment to Complaint.

Amendment to Complaint AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT NAMING DOE/ROE ROE 1 as FLEETWOOD WINDOWS & DOOR Comment AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT NAMING DOE/ROE ROE 1 as FLEETWOOD WINDOWS & DOORS

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR SESSION DATE: 10/8 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Comment SESSION DATE: 10/8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 11 SENT FOR SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • ADR Stipulation and Order Due in Clerk's Office.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial. Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Master Calendar to set MSC date accordingly and send notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Notice of referral to ADR and Notice to file Stipulation and. Additional Info: Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • Financial info for LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. INC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Financial: LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. INC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Financial info for ELLIOTT, FOREST : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-075357-HOJ ACREE, MARISSA N. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Financial info for ELLIOTT, FOREST : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Financial info for ELLIOTT, FOREST : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-065732-HOJ ACREE, MARISSA N. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Financial info for ELLIOTT, FOREST : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Financial: ELLIOTT, FOREST; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-049340-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial: LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENCIONI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY,INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where Fleetwood Aluminum Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLEETWOOD WINDOW AND DOORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSOMWORTH, BRADLEY D