This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 00:07:52 (UTC).

Leighton Lang vs. Felicia Whiteside, et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Leighton Lang filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Felicia Whiteside. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S., Weiner, Marie S, Reyna, Renee C and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4671

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S.

Weiner, Marie S

Reyna, Renee C

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Lang, Leighton

STEVENS, LORENZO

ROES 1-10

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Whiteside, Felicia

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, OR INTEREST IN THE SUBJECT PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE TO THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

STEVENS, LORENZO

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, PAUL K.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

COWAN, JOHN E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/23/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 2/23/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/15/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LEE, PAUL K.DefendantAttorney: COWAN, JOHN E

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Complaint.

00236892.pdf

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 8/11/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 8/11/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Declaration.

Declaration OF DUE DILIGENCE TO EFFECT PERSONAL SERVICE OF CROSS-DEFENDANT LORENZO STEVENS Comment OF DUE DILIGENCE TO EFFECT PERSONAL SERVICE OF CROSS-DEFENDANT LORENZO STEVENS

Answer.

Answer

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 2/23/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 2/23/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/15/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LEE, PAUL K.DefendantAttorney: COWAN, JOHN E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service. Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice of CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment of CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 11/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 11/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens). Additional Info: Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lang, Leighton : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-041507-HOJ Lang, Leighton $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Lang, Leighton : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Lang, Leighton; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, PAUL K.