Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 09:46:57 (UTC).

Legacy Exhibitor Services, Inc. vs. Electronic Arts, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Legacy Exhibitor Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Electronic Arts, Inc . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2176

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Legacy Exhibitor Services, Inc.

Defendants

AAA FLAG & BANNER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

Electronic Arts, Inc.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORR, RICHARD W.

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: Legacy Exhibitor Services Inc.; Electronic Arts, Inc.; AAA FLAG & BANNER MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.; DOES 1 TO 10; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 8/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Legacy Exhibitor Services, Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-020691-HOJ Legacy Exhibitor Services, Inc. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Legacy Exhibitor Services, Inc. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Legacy Exhibitor Services, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 05/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Electronic Arts, Inc., a Delaware corporation is a litigant