Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:40 (UTC).

LAURIE GAGGERO vs. PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 LAURIE GAGGERO filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L. and Law and Motion, -. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2811

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L.

Law and Motion, -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAGGERO, LAURIE

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

A&C TOWING AND TRANSPORTATION COMPANY

PUTNAM CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC.

ROES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRESPO, RAFAEL, JR

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CUSTER, CHARLES S

NEVIS, CHRISTOPHER J

 

Court Documents

Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to.

Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES Comment COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 12/06/2018 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES Comment REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/20/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel FORM INTERROGATORIES AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES Comment FORM INTERROGATORIES AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS Comment REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES Comment REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

Amended Summons Issued / Filed.

Amended Summons Issued / Filed First Amended Complaint Comment First Amended Complaint

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FOR INTERROGATORIES Comment OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FOR INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION O Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 4/17 Comment CMC 4/17

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Motion to Compel. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Law and Motion - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment FORM INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Motion to Compel Interrogatories (form and special). Additional Info: Judicial Officer Law and Motion - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Motion to Compel. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Law and Motion - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to. Additional Info: Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES Comment COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to. Additional Info: Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES Comment COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to. Additional Info: Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS Comment COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES Comment REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support. Additional Info: Declaration in Support OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FOR INTERROGATORIES Comment OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FOR INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • Financial info for A&C TOWING AND TRANSPORTATION COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-008383-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS INC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Financial info for A&C TOWING AND TRANSPORTATION COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Financial: A&C TOWING AND TRANSPORTATION COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $705.00; Total Payments and Credits $705.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Financial info for PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC. : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-004274-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS, INC $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Financial info for PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC. : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Financial info for PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Financial: PUTNAM AUTOMOTIVE, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for GAGGERO, LAURIE : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037419-HOJ CRESPO, RAFAEL, JR $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for GAGGERO, LAURIE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: GAGGERO, LAURIE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less