This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 20:16:00 (UTC).

L,A, COMMERCIAL VS LAN HUA INC ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2012 L,A, COMMERCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAN HUA INC ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4701

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC

CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP

Defendant

LAN HUA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMILTON, CAROL R.

Defendant Attorney

JEW, LEON E

 

Court Documents

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Comment COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE) TIME ESTIMATE 02:00 HOURS

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6322.1 FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10000.

ANSWER Comment ANS5: (L) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC FILED BY LAN HUA INC REPRESENTED BY LEON E JEW - PRAYER AMOUNT LESS THAN $10,000.00

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC AS TO LAN HUA INC BY SUB-SERVING ESTHER GRANT, AGENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/17/12.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Action.

FILING Comment AIMCT1: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. TIME ESTIMATE: 02:00 HOUR(S)

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; LAN HUA INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED. ORIGINAL TO FOLLOW VIA MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment PNCT: PRINT NOTICES FOR COURT TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE) TIME ESTIMATE 02:00 HOURS Comment COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE) TIME ESTIMATE 02:00 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • DocketCourt Trial.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: PJ COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE) TIME ESTIMATE 02:00 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment COMM: MEMO TO SET WITH FILE SENT TO MASTER CAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. TIME ESTIMATE: 02:00 Comment AIMCT1: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM REQUESTING COURT TRIAL FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. TIME ESTIMATE: 02:00 HOUR(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC AS TO LAN HUA Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC AS TO LAN HUA INC BY SUB-SERVING ESTHER GRANT, AGENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/17/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for LAN HUA INC; Case Payment Receipt # 201207190651 LAN HUA INC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC; Case Payment Receipt # 201206250237 L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6322.1 FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC Comment DECL: DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6322.1 FILED BY L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120625-0237-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, Sta.. —ar number, and address) FOR COURT USE ONLY

CARQL R.” HAMILTON Bar No. 178318 Attorney at Law 317 So. Brand Blvd.

Glendale, CA 91204-1701 TELEPHONENO (B18) 543-5999 FaxNo. (Optona (818) 551-6829

E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional) ATTORNEYFOR(Vame) Plaintiff, L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP

FILED

INC.

MAILING ADDRESS

cyanpzircooe Redwood City, CA 94063 BRANCHNAME. LIMITED CIVIL

PLAINTIFF: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP;

DEFENDANT: LAN HUA, INC., a Corporation, dba TOKYO STAR, adba SUNSHINE CAFE;

[X] ooes1to 10, inclusive

CONTRACT

COMPLAINT (1 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number):

(| CROSS-COMPLAINT [ ] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number): Jurisdiction (check all that apply):

ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded does not exceed $10,000 [ ] exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000

[__] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000)

[_1 ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint from limited to unlimited

___| from unlimited to limited 1. Plaintiff* (name or names): L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., a Corporation, dba CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP; alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names): LAN HUA, INC., a Corporation, dba TOKYO STAR, adba SUNSHINE CAFE; 2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 3 3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult except plaintiff (name): L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.

JUN 2 0 2012

CASE NUMBER

CLJ 514701

(1) a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] other (specify):

b. Plaintiff (name): L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. a. has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP

b. [__] has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify):

c. [_] Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c.

4. a. Each defendant named above is a natural person except defendant (name): LAN HUA, INC. [__| except defendant (name):

(1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (1) (__] a business organization, form unknown

(2) a corporation (2) [__] a corporation

(3) (__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) [__] a public entity (describe): (4) [__] a public entity (describe):

(5) [__] other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify):

* If this form 1s used as a cross-complaint, plaintiff means cross-complainant and defendant means cross-defendant Page 1 of 2

5:3;2' :ng,—o%v:mql f:fr g;:;g?:lg Use c OMPLAINT—Con trac t S Code of Civil Procedure, § 425.12 PLD-C-001 [Rev. January 1, 2007] olu qflg

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jew, Leon E.