This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 20:01:36 (UTC).

KOREEN PIAZZA-BYRNE vs. JACOB CHI, Doctor of Dental Sur, et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 KOREEN PIAZZA-BYRNE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JACOB CHI, Doctor of Dental Sur,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L, Buchwald, Gerald J, KARESH, Scott, Joseph C, Davis, III, Leland and DUBOIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1249

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L

Buchwald, Gerald J

KARESH

Scott, Joseph C

Davis, III, Leland

DUBOIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIAZZA-BYRNE, KOREEN

Defendants

DOES 1-50

CHI, JACOB, Doctor of Dental Sur

WEDEKING, TODD, Doctor of Dental Sur

TODD WEDEKING, D.D.S., DENTAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANGOS, ILYA D

Defendant Attorneys

KOWALSKI, MICHAEL

MEAGHER, DANIEL J

DINEEN, CIARA M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOT Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOT Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION Comment OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL D Comment OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE.

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIREACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIREACTION

Mandatory Settlement Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/09/2019 Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: PIAZZA-BYRNE, KOREENAttorney: FRANGOS, ILYA DDefendant: CHI, JACOB, Doctor of Dental SurAttorney: KOWALSKI, MICHAELDefendant: WEDEKING, TODD, Doctor of Dental Sur

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE; ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE; ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIALSigned by: JUDGE KARESHDate Signed: 02/ Comment Type: GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL Signed by: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 02/07/19

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION Comment OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL D Comment OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE.

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE Comment FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Buchwald Gerald J.

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 7 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; PIAZZA-BYRNE, KOREEN; CHI, JACOB, Doctor of Dental Sur; WEDEKING, TODD, Doctor of Dental Sur; TODD WEDEKING, D.D.S., DENTAL CORPORATION; DOES 1-50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIREACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIREACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/09/2019 Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: PIAZZA-BYRNE, KOREENAttorney: FRANGOS, ILYA DDefendant: CHI, JACOB, Doctor of Dental SurAttorney: KOWALSKI, MICHAELDefendant: WEDEKING, TODD, Doctor of Dental Sur

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.; Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE; ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE; ETC... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOT Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for PIAZZA-BYRNE, KOREEN; Case Payment Receipt # 2018-016825-HOJ FRANGOS, ILYA D $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for PIAZZA-BYRNE, KOREEN; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • FinancialFinancial; PIAZZA-BYRNE, KOREEN; Total Financial Assessment $705.00; Total Payments and Credits $705.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/12/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNI FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

KOREEN PIAZZA-BYRNE, Case No. 18CIV01249 Plaintiff, EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR VS. LEAVE TO FILE FIRST

AMENDEDMENT TO COMPLAINT

JACOB CH]I, D.D.S., TODD WEDEKING, D.D.S., TODD WEDEKING, D.D.S., DENTAL| DATE: June 1, 2018

CORPORATION, and TIME: 2:00 p.m. DOES 1-50, DEPT: Presiding Judge Defendants. Accompanying Pleadmgs Memorandum of

Points and Authorities in Support of Application for Order to File First Amendment to Complaint; [Proposed] Orde to File First Amendment to Complaint

O &0 3 O W

TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD:

PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT plaintiff Koreen Piazza-Byrne, through her counsel, is proceeding ex parte by filing this application for an order granting leave to file first amendment to complaint.

This application is made and based upon the grounds that Plaintiff is amending the complaint to correct the name of one of the defendants, add a new defendant as a party, and include the date of treatment that is the subject of this incident.

The parties have entered into a stipulation and have agreed to allow plaintiff Koreen Piazza- Byrne to file a First Amended Complaint in this matter.

This Application is based upon the attached Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of Ilya D. Frangos, the Stipulation of the Parties, and all records and papers in the file as well as upon any oral or documentary evidence as may be heard at the hearing of this

application.

Date: May 30, 2018

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANGOS, ILYA D.