This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 16:49:58 (UTC).

Khelous Bader vs. Safeway, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Khelous Bader filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Safeway, Inc . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5190

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bader, Khelous

Defendants

Safeway, Inc.

ALBERTSON COMPANIES, INC.

ALBERTSON'S LLC

ALBERTSONS SAFEWAY LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONIG, REUBEN J.

Defendant Attorney

MOORE, KATHERINE R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Safeway, Inc. : Transaction Assessment $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Safeway, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for ALBERTSON COMPANIES, INC. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-047914-HOJ ALBERTSON COMPANIES, INC. $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: ALBERTSON COMPANIES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $0.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees. Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bader, Khelous : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-039618-HOJ Bader, Khelous $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bader, Khelous : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Bader, Khelous; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE, KATHERINE R.