Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 22:48:09 (UTC).

KHALIL LAMNAOUAR vs. D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 KHALIL LAMNAOUAR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Grandsaert, John L. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5221

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Grandsaert, John L.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAMNAOUAR, KHALIL

Defendants

DOES 1-40, INCLUSIVE

D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC

PERRY'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GORFEIN, AARON S

GORFEIN, AARON S.

Defendant Attorney

ARIAS, CATHY L.

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Conference.

Case Management Conference *CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GORFEIN, AARON S

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC, SERVED ON LARRY GARNICK - PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: LAMNAOUAR KHALIL; D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC; DOES 1-40, INCLUSIVE; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Jury Trial time estimate; 7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Mail returned undelivered. Additional Info: Comment NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL AND MSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial. Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Mail returned undelivered. Additional Info: Comment Return to Sender. Unable to Forward.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment DEPARTMENT 21

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2018
  • Financial info for D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-015872-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS, INC. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Financial info for D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Financial info for D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-085492-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OR PROCESS, INC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Financial info for D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Financial: D-LEW ENTERPRISES LLC; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Financial info for LAMNAOUAR, KHALIL : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-016167-HOJ GORFEIN, AARON S $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Financial info for LAMNAOUAR, KHALIL : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Financial info for LAMNAOUAR, KHALIL : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-078089-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Financial info for LAMNAOUAR, KHALIL : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Financial: LAMNAOUAR, KHALIL; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERRY(B) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARIAS, CATHY L