This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 02/03/2020 at 21:04:11 (UTC).

KERRIGAN CAPITAL, ETAL VS DAVID STROHM, ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2015 KERRIGAN CAPITAL, ETAL filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DAVID STROHM, ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Etezadi, Susan I, Dylina, Steven L, Scott, Joseph C, Grandsaert, John L, Buchwald, Gerald J., Grandsaert, John L., Dylina, Steven L., Scott, Joseph C., Etezadi, Susan I. and DuBois, Richard H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4431

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Etezadi, Susan I

Dylina, Steven L

Scott, Joseph C

Grandsaert, John L

Buchwald, Gerald J.

Grandsaert, John L.

Dylina, Steven L.

Scott, Joseph C.

Etezadi, Susan I.

DuBois, Richard H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC

KERRIGAN FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

DAVID STROHM

TOM PATTERSON

CARL PASCARELLA

AIDA ALVAREZ

RAUL VAZQUEZ

DAVE TOMLINSON

GREYLOCK XII LP

GREYLOCK XIII-A L.P.

GREYLOCK XII PRINCIPALS LLC

MAPACHE INVESTMENTS L.P. FUND

V, MADRONE PRTNERS, LP

PATTERSON, TOM

VAZQUEZ, RAUL

PASCARELLA, CARL

ALVAREZ, AIDA

GREYLOCK XII-A L.P.

STROHM, DAVID

Not Classified By Court

OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOLUMPHY, MARK C

840 Malcolm Road, #200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorneys

MCINTYRE, CAROLINE

BERGESON, DANIEL J.

SANTAMARIA, JESSICA VALENZUELA

Not Classified By Court Attorney

LOMBARD, JEFFREY D.

Other Attorneys

NASSIRI, KASSRA P

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/27/2017 Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 02:00 PM Result Held - Comment Further Proceedings Time Estimate: 30 Minutes

Declaration.

Declaration OF JOSE RAUL ALCANTAR IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY MR. JAMES GUTIERREZ'S MOTION TO QUASH DEFE Comment OF JOSE RAUL ALCANTAR IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY MR. JAMES GUTIERREZ'S MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE

Notice.

Notice of ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART/DENYING IN PART DEFTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY CLAS Comment of ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART/DENYING IN PART DEFTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO MODIFY CLASS CERTFICATION BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE

Motion to Compel.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L Hearing Time 01:30 PM Result Held Comment Time Estimate: 1 Hour

Declaration.

Declaration OF JEFFREY D. LOMBARD ISO DEFT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Comment OF JEFFREY D. LOMBARD ISO DEFT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Order received.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED. Comment POR: PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED.

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DA Comment PSN3: PROOF OF SERVICE (BY MAIL) OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 SERVED ON SEE SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/16 FILED.

Document.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF FEES DUE COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION RE: KERRIGAN FAMILY TRUST. Comment IMGDOC: CLERK'S NOTICE OF FEES DUE COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION RE: KERRIGAN FAMILY TRUST.

Notice.

Notice OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL Comment OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO MOTION TO APPOINT DISCOVERY REFEREE AND FOR SA Comment TO MOTION TO APPOINT DISCOVERY REFEREE AND FOR SANCTIONS

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement JOINT Comment JOINT

Opposition.

Opposition to Opportun Inc's Ex Parte Application to Compel Plaitniffs to Withdraw Motion to Compel Comment to Opportun, Inc's Ex Parte Application to Compel Plaitniffs to Withdraw Motion to Compel

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFTS AND NON-PARTY OPORTUN Comment OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFTS AND NON-PARTY OPORTUN TO PRODUCE SUPPLEMENTAL PRIVILEGE LOGS; ETC

Proof of Service.

Proof of Service OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SERVED BY MAIL & EMAIL Comment OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SERVED BY MAIL & EMAIL

Document.

NONPARTY JAMES GUTIERREZ'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY LOMBARD ETC., FILED. Comment FILED: NONPARTY JAMES GUTIERREZ'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY LOMBARD, ETC., FILED.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE ETC. SERVED ON SEE LIST BY OVERNIGHT MAIL, ELE Comment POSI: PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE, ETC. SERVED ON SEE LIST BY OVERNIGHT MAIL, ELECTRONIC MAIL WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/16.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC AS TO V MADR Comment NAR: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC AS TO V, MADRONE PRTNERS, LP FILED. SIGNED BY: SHAWNA BENFIELD. DATE SIGNED: 07/22/15

427 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketTrial De Novo. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Buchwald Gerald J. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment 15-DAY TIME ESTIMATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketConference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Buchwald Gerald J. Hearing Time 02:00 PM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketOrder Granting to Seal Document(s). Additional Info: Comment ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Buchwald Gerald J.; Judgment Type; Court Finding; Comment; Comment; (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: 1. THIS FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT INCORPORATES BY REFERENCE THE PROVISIONS OF ANS DEFINITIONS IN THE SETTLENMENT. ALL CAPITALIZED TERMS USED HEREIN SHALL HAVE THE SAME MEANING AS SET FORTH IN THE SETTLEMENT. ALL CAPITALIZED TERMS USED HEREIN SHALL HAVE THE SAME MEANINGS AS SET FORTH IN THE SETTLEMENT (IN ADDITION TO THOSE CAPITALIZED TERMS DEFINED HEREIN); IN THE CASE OF A CONFLICT, THE DEFINITIONS IN THE SETTLEMENT SHALL CONTROL. 2. PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6, THE COURT HAS AND WILL RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER THE SUBJECT MATTERN OF THE ACTION FOR PURPOSES OF ENFORCING THE SETTLEMENT AND THIS FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENTL HOWEVER, IF ANY DISPUTES ARISE OUT OF THE ADMINISTRATION OR ENFORCEMENT OF THE TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT, THOSE DISPUTES WILL FIRST BE ADDRESSED BY WILLIAM L. NAGLE, BY WAY OF EXPEDITED TELEPHONIC MEDIATION AND, IF UNSUCCESSFUL, THEN BY WAY OF NON-BINDING RECOMMENDATION THAT MAY BE APPEALED BY THE SETTLING PARTIES TO THE COURT. EACH SIDE SHALL BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND EXPENSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE RESOLUTION OF ANY SUCH DISPUTE. 3. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE NOTICE MAILED TO ALL CLASS MEMBERS CONSTITUTED THE BEST NOTICE PRACTICABLE UNDER THE CRCUMSTANCES TO ALL PERSONS ENTIRTLED TO SUCH NOTICE, AND THE NOTICE FULLY SATISFIEDTHE REQUIREMENTS OF CALIFORNIA LAW, INCLUDING CALIFORNIA RULE OF COURT 3.769 (f) AND DUE PROCESS UNDER THE CONSTITUTION OF THE UNITED STATES AND OTHER APPLICABLE LAW. 4. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE SETTLEMENT IS THE RESULT OF ARM'S-LENGTH NEGOTIATIONS BETWEEN EXPERIENCED COUNSEL, AND EXPERIENCED MEDIATORS, AND IS FAIR, REASONABLE AND ADEQUATE TO THE CLASS. 5. The Court finally approves the settlement in all respects and orders the settling parties to perform the terms of the settlement to the extent the settling parties have not already done so. The Court further approves the proposed Plan of Allocation and finds it is fair, reasonable and adequate to the class, and directs the Settlement Amount to be distributed pursuant to the plan of Allocation. For reasons stated on the record, the Plan of Allocation is as shown on Exh. One. 6. The Settling Parties and all Class members, including their Related Persons, and all other Related Persons, are hereby bound by the terms of the Settlement. 7. All Class Members who have not made their objection to the Settlement, Plan of Allocation, Fee and Expense Award, or Service Award in the manner provided in the Notice are deemed to have waived any objection by appeal, collateral attack, or otherwise. 8. The Settling parties are to bear their own costs, except as otherwise provided in the Settlement. 9. If for any reason the Effective Date does not occur, or the Settlement is cancelled, terminated, or otherwise fails to become Final for any reason, the Settling Parties shall be restored to their respective positions in the Action as of the date of the execution of the Settlement. The terms and provisions of the Settlement shall be null and void shall have no further force and effect with respect to the Settling Parties and neither the existence of the Settlement (not any negotiations preceding the Settlement nor any acts performed pursuant to, or in furtherance of the Settlement) shall be used in any manner for any purpose in any subsequent proceeding in the Action or in any other action or proceeding (other than to enforce any terms of the Settlement remaining in effect); and this Final Order and Judgment or other order entered in accordance with the terms of the Settlement shall be treated as vacated, nunc pro tunc. 10. The Court hereby approves the award of $2,400,000.00in attorneys' fees and $200,000.00 in costs to Class Counsel and finds that the amount of the award is fair and reasonable ("Fee and Expense Award"). The court further approves a service award of $10,000.00 to lead Plaintiff ("Service Award"). The Fee and Expense Award and the Service Award shall be paid from the total cash consideration in the Settlement, on the terms stated in the Settlement. In the event that, after payment of the Fee and Expense Award or the Service Award, either or both is reversed, vacated, or reduced by final non-appealable order, or the Settlement is terminated for any reason, class Counsel or Lead Plaintiff, as appropriate, shall, after receiving from Defendant's Counsel or from a court of appropriate jurisdiction notice of the termination of the Settlement or notice of any reduction of the awards by final non-appealable order, make appropriate refunds or repayments pursuant to the terms of the Settlement. 11. The Court finds that the Settling Parties and their respective counsel at all times complied with the requirements of California Code of Civil Procedure 128.7 and all other similar laws. 12. Any appeal or other proceeding pertaining to any order concerning the issue to the Fee and Expense Award or the Service Award shall not in any way delay or preclude any order )including, without limitation, this Final Order and judgment) from becoming Final. 13. All agreements made or orders entered during the course of the Action relating to the confidentially of information shall survive the settlement. 14. This Final Order and Judgment is a final, appealable judgment and should be entered forthwith by the clerk. All pending hearing dates are vacated. The following dates are vacated: MSC Feb. 29, 2019 PTC March 1st, 2019 JTR March 11, 2019. 9/17/2018 Judge Buchwald ); Party; Names: Payor; KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC; GREYLOCK XII-A L.P.; GREYLOCK XII PRINCIPALS LLC; MAPACHE INVESTMENTS L.P. FUND; V, MADRONE PRTNERS, LP; KERRIGAN FAMILY TRUST; STROHM, DAVID; PATTERSON, TOM; PASCARELLA, CARL; ALVAREZ, AIDA; VAZQUEZ, RAUL; TOMLINSON, DAVE; GREYLOCK XII LP; OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION; ATINAR CAPITAL II, LLC; GUTIERREZ, JAMES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT PLAN OF A Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT, PLAN OF ALLOCATION, FEE AND EXPENSE AWARD, AND SERVICE AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment. Additional Info: Judgment FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT PLAN OF ALLOCATION, FEE AND EXPENSE AWARD, A Comment FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT, PLAN OF ALLOCATION, FEE AND EXPENSE AWARD, AND SERVICE AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
803 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201506260635 KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: KERRIGAN CAPITAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment $2,015.00; Total Payments and Credits $2,015.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketConversion Action. Additional Info: Comment CPIE: PLEADING AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150626-0635-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less