This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:35:35 (UTC).

KERI SULLIVAN VS SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2016 KERI SULLIVAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Greenberg, Susan, Dylina, Steven L., DuBois, Richard H. and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8881

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Greenberg, Susan

Dylina, Steven L.

DuBois, Richard H.

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KERI SULLIVAN

SULLIVAN, KERI

Defendants

SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS

LUCKY SUPERMARKETS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIO

FOOD MAXX, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DEPAUL, MICHAEL J

ERLICH, JASON M

Defendant Attorneys

BOOMER, MITCHELL F

Sahouria, Janelle Jad

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case CONDITIONAL Comment CONDITIONAL

Motion.

Motion TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS ETC. Comment TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS, ETC.

Judgment on Jury Verdict.

Judgment on Jury Verdict

Continued Jury Trial.

*CIV Minute Order - Continued Jury Trial 09/29/2017 Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Trial Day 9 Parties Present Plaintiff: SULLIVAN, KERIAttorney: DEPAUL, MICHAEL JAttorney: ERLICH, JASON MDefendant: SAVE MART SUPERMARKETSAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL FAttorney: Sahouria, Janelle JadDefendantAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL FAttorney: Sahouria, Janelle Jad

Continued Jury Trial.

*CIV Minute Order - Continued Jury Trial 09/21/2017 Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Result Held - Comment Trial Day 3 Parties Present Plaintiff: SULLIVAN, KERIAttorney: DEPAUL, MICHAEL JAttorney: ERLICH, JASON MDefendant: SAVE MART SUPERMARKETSAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL FAttorney: Sahouria, Janelle JadDefendantAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL FAttorney: Sahouria, Janelle Jad

Objection.

Objection to Defendant's Notice of Intent to Present Videotaped Deposition at Trial Comment to Defendant's Notice of Intent to Present Videotaped Deposition at Trial

Trial Brief.

Trial Brief Defendant Comment Defendant

Opposition.

Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 Comment To Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2

Notice.

Notice OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND MANDATORY SETTLEME Comment OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

Exhibit List.

Exhibit List IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT

Continued Jury Trial.

*CIV Minute Order - Continued Jury Trial 09/25/2017 Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 09:30 AM Result Held - Comment Trial Day 5 Parties Present Plaintiff: SULLIVAN, KERIAttorney: DEPAUL, MICHAEL JAttorney: ERLICH, JASON MDefendant: SAVE MART SUPERMARKETSAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL FAttorney: Sahouria, Janelle JadDefendantAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL FAttorney: Sahouria, Janelle Jad

Witness List.

Witness List Defendant Comment Defendant

Exhibit List.

Exhibit List Plaintiff Comment Plaintiff

Motion In Limine.

Motion In Limine No. 5 To Exclude evidence Regarding Other Employees' Medical Leaves of Absence Comment No. 5 To Exclude evidence Regarding Other Employees' Medical Leaves of Absence

Order After Hearing.

Order After Hearing Hearing Type: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH S Comment Hearing Type: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS Signed by: JUDGE DUBOIS Date Signed: 08/31/17

Order.

Order Type: GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ETC. Signed by: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Comment Type: GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, ETC. Signed by: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 3/15/17 (COPY FORWARDED TO MASTER CALENDAR)

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of.

Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ETC. Comment JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; ETC. served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: DEPAUL, MICHAEL JDefendantAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL FDefendantAttorney: BOOMER, MITCHELL F

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (OF ENTIRE ACTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (CONDITIONAL).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Jury Verdict; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: SULLIVAN KERI; Awarded Against: SAVE MART SUPERMARKETS; Status: Active; Status Date: 10/16/2017; Status Comment: PLAINTIFF WILL SEEK HER PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS VIA MOTION BEFORE THIS COURT, AND THIS JUDGMENT WILL THEREINAFTER BE AMENDED TO REFLECT THE COURT'S ORDER REGARING THOSE AMOUNTS. THIS JUDGMENT SHALL NOT PRECLUDE DEFENDANT FROM BRINGING ANY APPROPRIATE POST-TRIAL MOTIONS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT OR NEW TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Disbursement. Additional Info: Comment Processed Disbursement for Jury Payroll of $281.02 to OPS for SULLIVAN Doc/Ref 10/06/17 PR 1909536645

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Disbursement. Additional Info: Comment Processed Disbursement for Jury Payroll of $1596.12 to OPS for SULLIVAN Doc/Ref 09/29/17 PR 1909536643

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Motion to Set Aside. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Motion for Judgment Not Withstanding Verdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Motion to Tax Costs. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment OR TAX COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Motion for a new trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case CONDITIONAL Comment CONDITIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
168 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Transaction Assessment $244.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Transaction Assessment $244.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-054348-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-045762-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Case Payment Receipt # 201606010195 SULLIVAN, KERI $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Financial info for SULLIVAN, KERI : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Financial: SULLIVAN, KERI; Total Financial Assessment $2,261.00; Total Payments and Credits $2,261.00

    Read MoreRead Less