This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 11:52:53 (UTC).

KENNY CHAVEZ vs. ROBYN SOUZA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 KENNY CHAVEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROBYN SOUZA,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L, Halperin, Ernst A, Chou, Danny Y and Reyna, Renee C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3026

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L

Halperin, Ernst A

Chou, Danny Y

Reyna, Renee C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ, KENNY

Defendants

APANOLIO CREEK RANCH, LLC

DOES 1-40

SOUZA, ROBYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON, RUSSELL A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should not be Comment Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution - 9/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment Case Management Conference - 3/8/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/16/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at Initial Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 09/02/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed d Comment & Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at 3/8/2021 CMC - 6/16/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Comment Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Commissioner Halperin Department 34

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 08/11/2021 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Delay in Prosecution

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sancti Comment Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at Initial Case Management Conference - 6/16/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 09/02/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should not be Comment Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution - 9/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 08/11/2021 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Delay in Prosecution

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Comment Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Commissioner Halperin Department 34

Order to Show Cause.

Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Comment Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Commissioner Halperin Department 34

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/16/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at Initial Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed d Comment & Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at 3/8/2021 CMC - 6/16/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sancti Comment Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at Initial Case Management Conference - 6/16/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/08/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 09/02/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should not be Comment Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Entire Action Should not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution - 9/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 08/11/2021 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Delay in Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Comment Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Commissioner Halperin Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause.; Additional Info: Order to Show Cause Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Comment Why the Entire Action Should Not be Dismissed for Delay in Prosecution signed by Commissioner Halperin Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/16/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at Initial Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed d Comment & Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at 3/8/2021 CMC - 6/16/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sancti Comment Case Management Conference & Order to Show Cause re: Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed due to Failure to Appear at Initial Case Management Conference - 6/16/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/09/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for CHAVEZ, KENNY; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-036145-HOJ ONE LEGAL $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for CHAVEZ, KENNY; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; CHAVEZ, KENNY; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBINSON, RUSSELL A