This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 15:48:57 (UTC).

Kelsey Lynn Unger vs. William James McKeever, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Kelsey Lynn Unger filed an Other lawsuit against William James McKeever. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y. and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3972

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y.

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unger, Kelsey Lynn

Defendants

McKeever, William James

Piazzo, Francisco Jeep

DOES 1-30

The estate and intestate successors of William James McKeever, deceased, and all persons claiming by, through, or under such decedent

Not Yet Classified

The estate and intestate successors of William James McKeever, deceased

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDONALD, STEVEN E.

Defendant Attorney

KNITTER, DAVID G

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of DEFENDANT FRANCISCO JEEP PIAZZO'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR QUIET Comment DEFENDANT FRANCISCO JEEP PIAZZO'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE SLANDER OF TITLE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint wExs and Verification.pdf

Summons Issued / Filed.

Unger v. McKeever Summons-I.pdf

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet-Image.pdf

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Comment CMC 2/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Piazzo, Francisco Jeep : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-043845-HOJ Piazzo, Francisco Jeep $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Piazzo, Francisco Jeep : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Piazzo, Francisco Jeep; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of DEFENDANT FRANCISCO JEEP PIAZZO'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR QUIET Comment DEFENDANT FRANCISCO JEEP PIAZZO'S ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE SLANDER OF TITLE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Unger, Kelsey Lynn : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036310-HOJ Unger, Kelsey Lynn $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Unger, Kelsey Lynn : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Unger, Kelsey Lynn; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less