This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:58:02 (UTC).

KELLY HONAN AND ADAM BEEH

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 KELLY HONAN AND ADAM BEEH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8650

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HONAN, KELLY MICHELLE

Respondent

BEEH, ADAM MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: BEEH ADAM MICHAEL; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: HONAN, KELLY MICHELLE; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DDUJ: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment MSE: MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 02/08/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Comment JNM: JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED; MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 02/08/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • Document. Additional Info: Comment FILED: STIPULATION/WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE BY PET/RESP. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JFDE: JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DOCUMENT EXAMINER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Request to enter default filed. Additional Info: Comment RDDEF: (FL) REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF HONAN AS TO ADAM MICHAEL BEEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Default Received.. Additional Info: Comment DR: DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Income & Expense Declaration. Additional Info: Comment IE: INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY KELLY MICHELLE HONAN

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Case assigned to Department for all purposes. Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 15 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Notice of ADR. Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY KELLY MICHELLE HONAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120806-0752-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership. Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for HONAN, KELLY MICHELLE : Case Payment Receipt # 201208060752 HONAN, KELLY MICHELLE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial info for HONAN, KELLY MICHELLE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Financial: HONAN, KELLY MICHELLE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less