This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/20/2021 at 08:37:33 (UTC).

KATRINA DENOS vs. CALTRAIN, et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 KATRINA DENOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALTRAIN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Scott, Joseph C., Grandsaert, John L., Karesh, Jonathan E., Karesh, Jonathan E, Grandsaert, John L, Fineman, Nancy L, Scott, Joseph C, Halperin, Ernst A and Reyna, Renee C. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1963

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Scott, Joseph C.

Grandsaert, John L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Karesh, Jonathan E

Grandsaert, John L

Fineman, Nancy L

Scott, Joseph C

Halperin, Ernst A

Reyna, Renee C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENOS, KATRINA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC.

BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50

CALTRAIN

BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (HOLDING) USA INC.

PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD

Defendant and Cross Defendant

PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HROSHAU, MKALAI

HROSHAU, MIKALAI

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBINSON, RALPH W.

MASTER, TODD H.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

MASTER, TODD H.

 

Court Documents

Order Denying.

Order Denying DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE December 7 DATE IS OVERSET AND UNAVAILABLE Comment DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, THE December 7 DATE IS OVERSET AND UNAVAILABLE

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received TO CONTINUE TRIAL Comment TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Stipulation.

Stipulation TO CONTINUE TRIAL Comment TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Jury Trial.

Original Type Jury Trial Jury Trial 07/13/2020 ~CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L.

Change of Address.

Change of Address OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION - PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY MIKALAI HROSHAU Comment OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION - PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY MIKALAI HROSHAU

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received STIP AND ORDER TO ADR; SENT TO DEPT 11 Comment STIP AND ORDER TO ADR; SENT TO DEPT 11

Notice of referral to ADR and Notice to file Stipulation and.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

Notice of referral to ADR and Notice to file Stipulation and.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.

Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 05/12/2021 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY CROSS-COMPLAINT STILL ACTIVE Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY, CROSS-COMPLAINT STILL ACTIVE

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice against PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT Comment With Prejudice against PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD on CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORP

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF Comment OSC Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re CMC / TSC on 04/20/21 in Dept. 4 SSF. Comment CMC / TSC on 04/20/21 in Dept. 4 SSF.

Trial Setting Conference.

Original Type Trial Setting Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Trial Setting Conference 02/23/2021 Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM Result Held

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action ~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 05/12/2021 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment (notice to be mailed out by Clerk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: DENOS KATRINA; CALTRAIN; PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD; BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORPORATION; BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC.; BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (HOLDING) USA INC.; DOES 1 TO 50; Comment: DISMISSAL AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY, CROSS-COMPLAINT STILL ACTIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Fineman Nancy L.; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Name: PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD; Comment: Dismissal as to Cross-Defendant PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD on CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY CROSS-COMPLAINT STILL ACTIVE Comment With Prejudice AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY, CROSS-COMPLAINT STILL ACTIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties). Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice against PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT Comment With Prejudice against PENINSULA CORRIDOR JOINT POWERS BOARD on CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF Comment OSC Re: Dismissal - 5/12/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for DENOS, KATRINA : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-021914-HOJ ONE LEGAL $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for DENOS, KATRINA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: DENOS, KATRINA; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (HOLDING) USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALTRAIN is a litigant

Latest cases where BOMBARDIER TRANSIT CORPORATION is a litigant