This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 05:56:34 (UTC).

Justin Giusto and Courtney McGreal

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Justin Giusto and Courtney McGreal was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Burdick, Sarah P, Bergman, Lisa, Cordova, Paula, Cordova, Paula, DAVIS, Davis, III, Leland, Holt, Rachel E and Franchi, Don R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0892

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Burdick, Sarah P

Bergman, Lisa

Cordova, Paula, Cordova, Paula

DAVIS

Davis, III, Leland

Holt, Rachel E

Franchi, Don R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Giusto, Justin

Respondent

McGreal, Courtney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DELLA SANTINA, JOSEPH A.

Respondent Attorney

NAJAFI, ARMIN M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Signed By: JUDGE DAVIS Date Signed: 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder sent for signature to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: Giusto, JustinAttorney: DELLA SANTINA, JOSEPH A.Respondent: McGreal, CourtneyAttorney: NAJAFI, ARMIN M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketList of Proposed Exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketWitness List.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketOrder sent for signature to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Davis III, Leland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketOrder received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDV - Documents Picked Up.; Additional Info: Comment @ 11:55 AM by Justin Giusto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEx Parte sent to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Comment DENIED/HEARING SET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Denied - Hearing Set.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Application - DV Prevention with Minor Child File Date 05/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Submitted.; Additional Info: Comment E-FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less