This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 00:54:55 (UTC).

Juan Elias Morales, et al vs. DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE, et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Juan Elias Morales filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0892

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morales, Juan Elias

Defendants

Bayshore Motor Group

TOYOTA 101

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Bayshore Motor Group dba Toyota 101

Cardenas, Allison

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA

Defendant Attorney

MASSEY, MELANIE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral. Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bayshore Motor Group : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-016208-HOJ Bayshore Motor Group $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Bayshore Motor Group : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Bayshore Motor Group; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC... Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Morales, Juan Elias : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-007158-HOJ Morales, Juan Elias $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Morales, Juan Elias : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Morales, Juan Elias; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOYOTA 101 is a litigant

Latest cases where BAYSHORE MOTOR GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA