This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/08/2022 at 00:37:54 (UTC).

Josue Loayza vs. Timothy Johnson , et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Josue Loayza filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Timothy Johnson ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4550

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loayza, Josue

Defendants

Johnson , Timothy

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTINOVSKY, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

WALSH, CATHERINE A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Lien.

Notice of Lien NATIONAL LIABILITY & FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO CAL. LAB. CO Comment NATIONAL LIABILITY & FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF LIEN PURSUANT TO CAL. LAB. CODE 3850-3865. REQUEST TO BE PLACED ON SERVICE LIST FOR ALL PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Fee Waiver Granted.

Fee Waiver Granted Signed by ANTHONY BERINI on 08/25/2021 Comment Signed by ANTHONY BERINI on 08/25/2021

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 10/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 10/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 8/24/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 8/24/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/23/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: WALSH, CATHERINE A.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference 6/23/2022 at 9:00 am Comment 6/23/2022 at 9:00 am

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of COMPLAINT CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS, ETC... Comment COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SUMMONS, ETC...

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 10/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 10/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 8/24/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Comment 8/24/2022 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/23/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: WALSH, CATHERINE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference 6/23/2022 at 9:00 am Comment 6/23/2022 at 9:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Loayza, Josue; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; Loayza, Josue; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver Granted.; Additional Info: Fee Waiver Granted Signed by ANTHONY BERINI on 08/25/2021 Comment Signed by ANTHONY BERINI on 08/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees.; Additional Info: Comment Request to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less