This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 02/13/2023 at 16:46:17 (UTC).

Josiah Padilla vs. Mark Allen Barnes

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 Josiah Padilla filed an Other lawsuit against Mark Allen Barnes. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEE and Lee, Elizabeth K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5288

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

LEE

Lee, Elizabeth K

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Padilla, Josiah

Padilla, Maiza

Respondent

Barnes, Mark Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

NYKODYM, JOSEPH M.

HABBAS, TARIK RYAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition.

Petition FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MI Comment FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received SENT TO DPT 17; RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LIT Comment SENT TO DPT 17; RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received RE: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS Comment RE: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem.

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Signed by: JUDGE LEEOn: 12/23/2022 Comment Signed by: JUDGE LEE On: 12/23/2022

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Comment APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Compromise of Minor(s) Claims.

Original Type Compromise of Minor(s) Claims ~CIV Minute Order - Compromise of Minor(s) Claims 01/13/2023 Judicial Officer Lee Elizabeth K. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: NYKODYM, JOSEPH M.PetitionerAttorney: NYKODYM, JOSEPH M.

Order.

Order filed 01/13/23 Comment filed 01/13/23

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received FWD. TO DEPT. 17 ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT Comment FWD. TO DEPT. 17 ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received FWD. TO DEPT. 17 ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT Comment FWD. TO DEPT. 17 ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order filed 01/13/23 Comment filed 01/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompromise of Minor(s) Claims.; Additional Info: Original Type Compromise of Minor(s) Claims ~CIV Minute Order - Compromise of Minor(s) Claims 01/13/2023 Judicial Officer Lee Elizabeth K. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: NYKODYM, JOSEPH M.PetitionerAttorney: NYKODYM, JOSEPH M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Comment APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem.; Additional Info: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Signed by: JUDGE LEEOn: 12/23/2022 Comment Signed by: JUDGE LEE On: 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Padilla, Maiza; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-045947-HOJ Padilla, Maiza $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Padilla, Maiza; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Padilla, Maiza; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Compromise of Minor's Claim File Date 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received RE: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS Comment RE: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received SENT TO DPT 17; RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LIT Comment SENT TO DPT 17; RE: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition.; Additional Info: Petition FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MI Comment FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less