This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/03/2023 at 00:10:21 (UTC).

JOSEPH ARRUDA AND DENISE ARRUDA

Case Summary

On 09/30/2015 JOSEPH ARRUDA AND DENISE ARRUDA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Reyna, Renee C, Greenberg, Susan and Dabel, Sean P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0645

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Reyna, Renee C

Greenberg, Susan

Dabel, Sean P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARRUDA, JOSEPH VINCENT

Respondent

ARRUDA, DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCMURRAY, MIRISSA

Respondent Attorney

MELEN, MICHELLE A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: MCMURRAY, MIRISSARespondentAttorney: MELEN, MICHELLE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketStatus Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Not Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: MCMURRAY, MIRISSARespondentAttorney: MELEN, MICHELLE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: MCMURRAY, MIRISSARespondentAttorney: MELEN, MICHELLE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: MCMURRAY, MIRISSARespondentAttorney: MELEN, MICHELLE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present RespondentAttorney: MELEN, MICHELLE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: MCMURRAY, MIRISSARespondentAttorney: MELEN, MICHELLE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: MCMURRAY, MIRISSARespondentAttorney: MELEN, MICHELLE A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held - Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: MCMURRAY, MIRISSA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARRUDA, JOSEPH VINCENT; Case Payment Receipt # 201509300227 ARRUDA, JOSEPH VINCENT $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for ARRUDA, JOSEPH VINCENT; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • FinancialFinancial; ARRUDA, JOSEPH VINCENT; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution without Minor Child File Date 09/30/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 3 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY JOSEPH VINCENT ARRUDA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150930-0227-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCMURRAY, MIRISSA