This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 15:11:36 (UTC).

Josefa Soto Brito vs. Kellermeyer Bergensons Services LLC, a limited liability company, et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 Josefa Soto Brito filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Kellermeyer Bergensons Services LLC, a limited liability company,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5320

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Soto Brito, Josefa

Defendants

Kellermeyer Bergensons Services LLC, a limited liability company

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEGAKIS, CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED ON TRUDY D Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON TRUDY DESBIENS, CLERK, CSC-AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEETSERVED ON TRUDY D Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON TRUDY DESBIENS, CLERK, CSC-AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Soto Brito, Josefa; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-045551-HOJ Soto Brito, Josefa $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Soto Brito, Josefa; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Soto Brito, Josefa; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less