This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/24/2019 at 00:04:07 (UTC).

JON SIMONTON VS. DROPBOX, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 JON SIMONTON filed an Other lawsuit against DROPBOX, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S. and Fineman, Nancy L.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5417

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S.

Fineman, Nancy L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simonton, Jon

Defendants

Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Incorporated

Ferdowsi , Arash

KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

Houston , Andrew W.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

JMP Securities LLC

Dropbox, Inc.

Allen & Company LLC

Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.

Blair , Donald W.

Piper Jaffray & Co.

Jefferies LLC

Schreier , R. Bryan

Mylod, Robert J., JR

Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC

Regan , Timothy J.

Sequoia Capital XII, L.P.

Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASNOCH, JOHN T

Defendant Attorneys

CLOSE, MATTHEW WILLIAM

STRICKLAND, RODNEY G.

EGGLETON, KEITH E

SEITE, EVAN L.

LOCKER, NINA F.

OLIVAR, HARRY A, JR

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of 1. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII Comment 1. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII, SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII PRINCIPALS FUND, LLC ETC.... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Notice.

Notice OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS Comment OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS

Notice.

Notice Notice OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII L.P., SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII PRINCIPALS FUND, LLC, Comment Notice OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII, L.P., SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII PRINCIPALS FUND, LLC, SEQUOIA TECHNOLOGY PARTNERS XII, L.P., AND SC XII MANAGEMENT, LLC

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; ETC...

Notice.

Notice of complex case management conference and case management order No.1 Comment of complex case management conference and case management order No.1

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Affidavit of Mailing

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF NINA LOCKER IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE Comment OF NINA LOCKER IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Affidavit of Mailing

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Fineman Nancy L.; Judgment Type; Consolidated; Comment; Comment; (CONSOLIDATED INTO CASE 19-CIV-05089); Party; Names: Simonton, Jon; Houston , Andrew W.; Vashee , Ajay V.; Regan , Timothy J.; Blair , Donald W.; Ferdowsi , Arash; Jacobs , Paul E.; Mylod, Robert J., JR; Rice , Condoleezza; Schreier , R. Bryan; Whitman , Margaret C.; Dropbox, Inc.; Sequoia Capital XII, L.P.; Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC; Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P.; SC XII Management, LLC; Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Allen & Company LLC; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner, & Smith Incorporated; RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Jefferies LLC; Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.; Canaccord Genuity LLC; JMP Securities LLC; KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.; Piper Jaffray & Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment CLASS ACTION SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 01:30 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Case Consolidation Granted. Additional Info: Comment Lead Case: 19-CIV-05417

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of. Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS Comment OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of. Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of 1. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII Comment 1. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII, SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII PRINCIPALS FUND, LLC ETC.... served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: Notice Notice OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII L.P., SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII PRINCIPALS FUND, LLC, Comment Notice OF APPEARANCE OF SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII, L.P., SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII PRINCIPALS FUND, LLC, SEQUOIA TECHNOLOGY PARTNERS XII, L.P., AND SC XII MANAGEMENT, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Order. Additional Info: Notice of Entry of Order NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of. Additional Info: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC... Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation. Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Financial info for Simonton, Jon : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-058457-HOJ JASNOCH, JOHN T $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Financial info for Simonton, Jon : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Financial info for Simonton, Jon : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2019-056973-HOJ Simonton, Jon $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Financial info for Simonton, Jon : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Financial: Simonton, Jon; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEQUOIA CAPITAL XII PRINCIPALS FUND, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MACQUARIE CAPITAL (USA) INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KEYBANC CAPITAL MARKETS INC. is a litigant