This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:16:05 (UTC).

JOHNY I IBRAHIM AND LILYANA AIWAS

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 JOHNY I IBRAHIM AND LILYANA AIWAS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Greenberg, Susan, Swope, V Raymond and Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8187

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Greenberg, Susan

Swope, V Raymond

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA

Respondent

AIWAS, LILYANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Name: AIWAS LILYANA; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/MINOR CHILD; Party; Name: IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA; Comment: 0001 PETITION - DISSO W/MINOR CHILD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY REBECCA HUERTA ON 05/10/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CSA: AT 02:18 COURT STANDS ADJOURNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: THE COURT OSC FOR CONTEMPT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COM: MR. DAYE INFORMS THE COURT THAT RESPONDENT LEARNED PETITIONER WAS NOT GOING TO PROCEED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment ACC: AT 02:16 COURT CONVENES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AT: ATTORNEY(S): ROBERT DAYE APPEARED ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT LILYANA AIWAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: JOHNY ISHALA IBRAHIM NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Comment JCRB: HONORABLE V. RAYMOND SWOPE, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: REBECCA HUERTA, COURT REPORTER: GERALDINE VANDEVELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Swope V. Raymond Comment TRIAL: FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL (SHORT CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE 03:00 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
379 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2013
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Case Payment Receipt # 201308190884 IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA $244.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Transaction Assessment $244.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Case Payment Receipt # 201304300216 IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Case Payment Receipt # 201302080221 IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Case Payment Receipt # 201302080220 IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Case Payment Receipt # 201206260684 IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial info for IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Financial: IBRAHIM, JOHNY ISHALA; Total Financial Assessment $1,238.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,238.00

    Read MoreRead Less