This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/06/2022 at 20:44:16 (UTC).

JOHN WOODS RAY, IV and JENNIFER ANN RAY

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 JOHN WOODS RAY, IV and JENNIFER ANN RAY was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borja, Hugo R, Davis, III, Leland and Dabel, Sean P. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********01-B

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borja, Hugo R

Davis, III, Leland

Dabel, Sean P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAY, JOHN WOODS, IV

Respondent

RAY, JENNIFER ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DELLA SANTINA, JOSEPH A.

Respondent Attorney

KASS, BRADLEY M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOrder sent for signature to Judicial Officer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOrder received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCover Letter re: Order After Hearing Pursuant to CRC 5.125.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCourt Trial - Long Cause.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment (matter is double set by the Court and Parties)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference Judicial Officer Dabel Sean P. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: RAY, JOHN WOODS, IVAttorney: DELLA SANTINA, JOSEPH A.Respondent: RAY, JENNIFER ANNAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSupplemental.; Additional Info: Comment DECLARATION IN FURTHER RESPONSE TO DVRO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference Statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference Statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDomestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing.; Additional Info: Original Type Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing Judicial Officer Borja Hugo R. Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Parties Present Petitioner: RAY, JOHN WOODS, IVAttorney: DELLA SANTINA, JOSEPH A.Respondent: RAY, JENNIFER ANNAttorney: KASS, BRADLEY M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketResponse.; Additional Info: Comment to Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Application - DV Prevention with Minor Child File Date 01/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Denied - Hearing Set.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketConfidential CLETS Information RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less