This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 09:02:34 (UTC).

JOHN RA DOE vs. County of San Mateo, et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 JOHN RA DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County of San Mateo,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0033

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE, JOHN RA

Defendants

County of San Mateo

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOETHALS, JOSEPH M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT CMC P Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, CMC PACKET served to DAVID SILBERMAN, CHIEF DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case 22-CIV-05397 Comment 22-CIV-05397

Order.

Order Type: ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASESSigned by: NANCY L FINEMANDate Signed: 1/25/2023 Comment Type: ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Signed by: NANCY L FINEMAN Date Signed: 1/25/2023

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Comment ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

Second Amended Complaint.

Amended Answer

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSecond Amended Complaint.; Additional Info: Amended Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint.; Additional Info: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Attorney.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Comment ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASESSigned by: NANCY L FINEMANDate Signed: 1/25/2023 Comment Type: ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES Signed by: NANCY L FINEMAN Date Signed: 1/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DOE, JOHN RA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-002402-HOJ DOE, JOHN RA $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DOE, JOHN RA; Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT CMC P Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, CMC PACKET served to DAVID SILBERMAN, CHIEF DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DOE, JOHN RA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-000334-HOJ DOE, JOHN RA $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for DOE, JOHN RA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; DOE, JOHN RA; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less