This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/17/2019 at 00:03:30 (UTC).

JOHN MOORE, III vs NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 JOHN MOORE, III filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weiner, Marie S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4765

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weiner, Marie S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOORE, JOHN S, III

INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant

NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY, A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMMOND, JULIAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 served on NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR; HENRY R Comment AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 served on NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR; HENRY ROTH

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Amended CMO #1 Comment Amended CMO #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order Amended CMO #1 Comment Amended CMO #1

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE FOR ALL PURPOSE DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX, SE Comment NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE FOR ALL PURPOSE, DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX, SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COMPLEX FEES DUES; ETC... served on HENRY ROTH

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation.

Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

Class Action Complex Notice.

Class Action Complex Notice

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court.

Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Cour Comment Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Comment NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMO #2 Comment CMO #2

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint.

Amended Complaint FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Comment FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE R Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COMPLEX FEES DUE by serving HENRY ROTH, PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 03:00 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment CLASS ACTION SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court. Additional Info: Notice of Removal of Entire Case to Federal Court Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Cour Comment Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT Comment NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 served on SEE SERVICE LIST Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CMO #2 Comment CMO #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Order. Additional Info: Case Management Order CMO #2 Comment CMO #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint. Additional Info: Amended Complaint FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Comment FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 served on NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR; HENRY R Comment AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 served on NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR; HENRY ROTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE R Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CERTIFICATE RE COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COMPLEX FEES DUE by serving HENRY ROTH, PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation. Additional Info: Certificate Re: Complex Case Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Class Action Complex Notice. Additional Info: Class Action Complex Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Financial info for MOORE, JOHN S, III : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-051111-HOJ ONE LEGAL $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Financial info for MOORE, JOHN S, III : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Financial info for MOORE, JOHN S, III : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Financial: MOORE, JOHN S, III; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOTRE DAME DE NAMUR UNIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES P WALKER TRUST UAD MAY 10 1991 AS AMENDED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMMOND JULIAN