This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 21:53:31 (UTC).

JOHN MARCUSSEN VS KATHRYN ELAINE SMITH

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 JOHN MARCUSSEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KATHRYN ELAINE SMITH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4912

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCUSSEN, JOHN

Defendant

SMITH, KATHRYN ELAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, JOHN J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; SMITH, KATHRYN ELAINE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MARCUSSEN, JOHN; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARCUSSEN, JOHN; Case Payment Receipt # 201206280586 MARCUSSEN, JOHN $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for MARCUSSEN, JOHN; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; MARCUSSEN, JOHN; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0586-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

226 RUTLEDGE STREET !

SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA 94110-5344

§ TeLepHoNENO: (415) 333-2000 FAXNO. (optonay: (415) 550-1935 E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional): ATTORNEY FOR (Name)y JOHN MARCUSSEN SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO sTReeT ADDRESS: 400 County Center maiLing ADDRess 400 County Center ciry anp zie cooe: Redwood City, California 94063 BRANCH NAME. . PLAINTIFF: JOHN MARCUSSEN

JEN JE ) SAN MATLE D COUNTY JUN 2§ 77

DOES1TO 25 )

COMPLAINT—Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrofigful Death [__| AMENDED (Number): _ ~ Type (check all that apply):

MOTOR VEHICLE [_] OTHER (specify): Property Damage [ ] Wrongful Death Personal Injury [ ] Other Damages (specify):

[__1 ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded does not exceed $10,000 _ . exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) [__] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint [ ] from limited to unlimited || from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff (name or names): JOHN MARCUSSEN

CASE NUMBER'

CNf514912

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY, JOHN J