This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 01:04:55 (UTC).

John K. Blake, JR, et al vs. Jeffrey Marden Leaver, et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 John K Blake, JR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jeffrey Marden Leaver. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fineman, Nancy L., Halperin, Ernst A and Fineman, Nancy L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4473

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fineman, Nancy L.

Halperin, Ernst A

Fineman, Nancy L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blake, John K., JR

Blake, Christine Chang

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Leaver, Jeffrey Marden

DOES ONE THROUGH FIFTY

LEAVER'S CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendant

MOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLAKE, JOHN K.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WELCH, STEPHEN B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Informal Discovery Conference.

Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 08/30/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 03:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BLAKE, JOHN K.DefendantAttorney: WELCH, STEPHEN B.

Notice.

Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Informal Discovery Conference.

Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 08/17/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BLAKE, JOHN K.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 05/27/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BLAKE, JOHN K.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT served on A BARCLAY BYRNES AND Comment PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT served on A BARCLAY BYRNES AND STEPHEN B. WELCH

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited)

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE NAME OF PARTY SERVED MUST Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE, NAME OF PARTY SERVED MUST MATCH THE COMPLAINT EXACTLY THE SAME

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 08/30/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BLAKE, JOHN K.DefendantAttorney: WELCH, STEPHEN B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY Comment OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment & Attorney Clay Burns for Defendant Jeffrey Marden Leaver dba Leaver Construction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 08/17/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: BLAKE, JOHN K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketADR Referral.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE NAME OF PARTY SERVED MUST Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IS QUESTIONABLE, NAME OF PARTY SERVED MUST MATCH THE COMPLAINT EXACTLY THE SAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Blake, John K., JR : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-039895-HOJ Blake, John K. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Blake, John K., JR : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Blake, John K., JR; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less