This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/13/2023 at 06:52:00 (UTC).

John JV Doe vs. County of San Mateo, et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 John JV Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County of San Mateo,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FINEMAN, FINEMAN FINEMAN, HEALY, Fineman, Nancy L and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5397

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

FINEMAN

FINEMAN FINEMAN

HEALY

Fineman, Nancy L

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doe, John JV

Defendants

County of San Mateo

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOETHALS, JOSEPH M.

Defendant Attorney

MCCLOSKEY, DANIEL T.

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Protective Order Return Letter - General Comment STIPULATED AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER; RETURNED UNSIGNED.

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Protective Order Return Letter - General Comment STIPULATED AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER; RETURNED UNSIGNED.

Informal Discovery Conference.

Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 05/25/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 03:00 PM Result Held

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACT Comment RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACTION AND RELATED CASES

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACTION AND RELATED CASES Comment Type: REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACTION AND RELATED CASES Signed by: JUDGE HEALY Date Signed: 5/12/2023

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AM Comment COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT DECLARATION OF DANIEL MCCLOSKEY IN SUPPORT OF COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received GRANTING COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED C Comment GRANTING COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike.

Motion to Strike PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received SUSTAINING COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment SUSTAINING COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF DANIEL MCCLOSKEY OF COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE Comment OF DANIEL MCCLOSKEY OF COUNTY OF SAN MATEO'S DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer to Amended Complaint.

Demurrer to Amended Complaint SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET.

Proposed Order Cover Sheet

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND COUNTY'S TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMP Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND COUNTY'S TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: TO EXTEND COUNTY'S TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTSSigned by: Comment Type: TO EXTEND COUNTY'S TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS Signed by: JUDGE FINEMAN Date Signed: 04/13/2023

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Second Amended Complaint.

Amended Complaint

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketMotion to Strike.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment 22CIV05397, 22CIV05402, 22CIV05404, 22CIV05405, 22CIV05493, 22CIV05494, 22CIV05495, 22CIV05496, 23CIV00033, 23CIV00034, 23CIV00035

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 02:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Protective Order Return Letter - General Comment STIPULATED AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER; RETURNED UNSIGNED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Informal Discovery Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Informal Discovery Conference 05/25/2023 Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 03:00 PM Result Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACT Comment RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACTION AND RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order.; Additional Info: Stipulation & Order Type: REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACTION AND RELATED CASES Comment Type: REGARDING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN THIS ACTION AND RELATED CASES Signed by: JUDGE HEALY Date Signed: 5/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for County of San Mateo; Transaction Assessment $180.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for County of San Mateo; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT CMC P Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT, CMC PACKET served to DAVID SILBERMAN, CHIEF DEPUTY COUNTY ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Doe, John JV; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-046297-HOJ Doe, John JV $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Doe, John JV; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Doe, John JV; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less