This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/09/2022 at 12:04:06 (UTC).

John Jadelrab vs CCFI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 John Jadelrab filed an Other lawsuit against CCFI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S and WEINER. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0064

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weiner, Marie S

Not Yet Classified

WEINER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jadelrab, John

Defendants

CCFI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATOFSKY, ALEX P

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, PAUL M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice.

Notice OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CCFI LLC Comment OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CCFI, LLC

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: TO STAY ACTION FOR MEDIATIONSigned by: JUDGE WEINERDate Signed: 3/2/2022 Comment Type: TO STAY ACTION FOR MEDIATION Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 3/2/2022

Complex Case Management Conference.

Original Type Complex Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Complex Case Management Conference 03/01/2022 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: KATOFSKY, ALEX PDefendantAttorney: SMITH, PAUL M.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice OF POSTING OF COMPLEX FEES Comment OF POSTING OF COMPLEX FEES

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order RE: ORDER FILED ON 01/27/2022 Comment RE: ORDER FILED ON 01/27/2022

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT;ETC,,, served on KOY SAECHAO, ON BEHALF O Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT;ETC,,, served on KOY SAECHAO, ON BEHALF OF CCFI,LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order.

Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order RE ORDER FILED ON 1/24/2022 Comment RE ORDER FILED ON 1/24/2022

Clerk's Notice of Fees Due Complex Litigation Designation.

Clerk's Notice of Fees Due Complex Litigation Designation

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMO #1; AND ORDER DESIGNATING PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION AS "COMPLEX" Comment CMO #1; AND ORDER DESIGNATING PAGA REPRESENTATIVE ACTION AS "COMPLEX"

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

Order Designating Case as Complex.

Order Designating Case as Complex ORDER DESIGNATING PAGA REPRESENTATIVE AS "COMPLEX" Comment ORDER DESIGNATING PAGA REPRESENTATIVE AS "COMPLEX"

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: Notice OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CCFI LLC Comment OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT CCFI, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Stayed Due To:.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order.; Additional Info: Stipulation & Order Type: TO STAY ACTION FOR MEDIATIONSigned by: JUDGE WEINERDate Signed: 3/2/2022 Comment Type: TO STAY ACTION FOR MEDIATION Signed by: JUDGE WEINER Date Signed: 3/2/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jadelrab, John; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-007905-HOJ Jadelrab, John $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jadelrab, John; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Complex Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Complex Case Management Conference 03/01/2022 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: KATOFSKY, ALEX PDefendantAttorney: SMITH, PAUL M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CCFI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-007145-HOJ CCFI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CCFI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Designating Case as Complex.; Additional Info: Order Designating Case as Complex ORDER DESIGNATING PAGA REPRESENTATIVE AS "COMPLEX" Comment ORDER DESIGNATING PAGA REPRESENTATIVE AS "COMPLEX"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jadelrab, John; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-000572-HOJ Jadelrab, John $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Jadelrab, John; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Jadelrab, John; Total Financial Assessment $1,455.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CCFI, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, PAUL M., II