This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 00:36:16 (UTC).

John C. Spesak vs. Mishelle Westendorf, et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 John C Spesak filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mishelle Westendorf. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y, SCOTT, Halperin, Ernst A, Scott, Joseph C and Healy, Nicole S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5580

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

SCOTT

Judges

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

Scott, Joseph C

Healy, Nicole S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spesak, John C.

Defendants

Westendorf, Mishelle

DOES 1 - 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYER, TODD K

Defendant Attorney

STEIN, DANIEL C.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Motion to Seal.

Original Type Motion to Seal ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Seal 09/30/2021 Judicial Officer Healy Nicole S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment PLAINTIFF JOHN C. SPESAK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

2021-09-23 Pltf's Reply ISO MTSeal.pdf Comment TO SEAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 11/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 11/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Order.

Order Type: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SLAPP SUIT PURSUANT TO CO Comment Type: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SLAPP SUIT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Signed by: JUDGE SCOTT Date Signed: 7/26/21

Order.

Order Type: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO SEALSigned by: JUDGE SCOTTDate Comment Type: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO SEAL Signed by: JUDGE SCOTT Date Signed: 7/26/21

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SL Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SLAPP SUIT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16 AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. FORWARDED TO DEPT 25

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO SEALFOR Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S MOTION TO SEAL FORWARDED TO DEPT 25

Notice of Ruling.

Notice of Ruling

Special Motion to Strike (SLAPP).

Original Type Special Motion to Strike (SLAPP) ~CIV Minute Order - Special Motion to Strike (SLAPP) 07/15/2021 Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

Motion to Seal.

Original Type Motion to Seal ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Seal 07/15/2021 Judicial Officer Scott Joseph C. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF PO Comment DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE SLAPP SUIT

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. STEIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE SLAPP SUIT PURS Comment DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. STEIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE SLAPP SUIT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16; AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEE AND COSTS

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketTentative ruling adopted and becomes order:.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNo appearance by any parties or their counsel of record..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment Court Reporter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Seal. Additional Info: Original Type Motion to Seal ~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Seal 09/30/2021 Judicial Officer Healy Nicole S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment PLAINTIFF JOHN C. SPESAK'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SEAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply. Additional Info: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply TO SEAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND REQUE Comment TO SEAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MISHELLE WESTENDORF'S ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 11/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 11/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - other/motion pending..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Comment CMC 4/20/21 at 10:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Spesak, John C. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-048649-HOJ Spesak, John C. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Spesak, John C. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Spesak, John C.; Total Financial Assessment $785.00; Total Payments and Credits $785.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DANIEL C.