This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:45:10 (UTC).

JOE CANTON, et al vs. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 JOE CANTON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC , A BUSINESS ENTITY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Law and Motion, -, Foiles, Robert D, Greenberg, Susan, Fineman, Nancy L., DuBois, Richard H. and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2816

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Law and Motion, -

Foiles, Robert D

Greenberg, Susan

Fineman, Nancy L.

DuBois, Richard H.

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANTON, JOE

CANTON, MARCIA

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN, HAYK M.

Defendant Attorney

KOZINSKA, MAGDALENA D

 

Court Documents

Notice.

Notice OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Comment OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee).

Motion (Unlimited Case First Appearance Fee)

Answer.

Answer GENERAL DENIAL OF DEFENDANT OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Comment GENERAL DENIAL OF DEFENDANT OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Strike 08/07/2018 Judicial Officer DuBois Richard H. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice.

Notice NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Comment NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPL Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Complaint.

Complaint

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/14/2018 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received PROPOSED ORDER Comment PROPOSED ORDER

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Motion to Strike.

~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Strike 09/14/2018 Judicial Officer Greenberg Susan Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present DefendantAttorney: KOZINSKA, MAGDALENA D

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Comment NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: CANTON JOE; CANTON, MARCIA; OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY; DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE.); Party; Names: CANTON JOE; CANTON, MARCIA; OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY; DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Fineman Nancy L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 3/19/19 Comment OSC re Dismissal 3/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 11/14/2018 Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial info for OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-045235-HOJ NATIONWIDE $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial info for OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY : Transaction Assessment $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Financial: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY; Total Financial Assessment $465.00; Total Payments and Credits $465.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CANTON, JOE : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037481-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CANTON, JOE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CANTON, JOE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less