This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:16:24 (UTC).

JIN QUAN CHEN VS KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 JIN QUAN CHEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREEMAN, BETH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6197

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

FREEMAN, BETH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEN, JIN QUAN

Defendant

SHETTLESWORTH, KENDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WU, SAM

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S5IF: 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Conversion Action.

APPLICATION (2) Comment SOE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF EVICTION DECLARATION, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND ORDER THAT JUDGMENT ENTERED IN THIS IS HEREBY STAYED THROUGH 10/22/12.

Order.

ORDER Comment O: ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED BY JUDGE SCOTT ON 08/17/12, FILED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CHEN AS TO KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DRV: DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT (2) Comment JCAT: JUDGMENT BY COURT AFTER TRIAL FILED AND ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

Conversion Action.

APPLICATION Comment APL: APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING FILED BY JIN QUAN CHEN

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER - FEE WAIVER Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 SIGNED BY CLERK ON 10/05/12.

Conversion Action.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCP: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES:

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSPM: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CHEN AS TO KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH FILED SHOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING. DATE OF MAILING: 08/17/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Conversion Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CHEN JIN QUAN; Awarded Against: SHETTLESWORTH, KENDALL; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 12/04/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CHEN FOR JIN QUAN CHEN JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CHEN AGAINST KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH PRINCIPAL IS $15,965.96. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $400.00. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $1,635.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $18,000.96.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CHEN JIN QUAN; Awarded Against: SHETTLESWORTH, KENDALL; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 09/17/12 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CHEN FOR JIN QUAN CHEN JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CHEN AGAINST KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 2794 DEVONSHIRE AVE REDWOOD CITY CA. 94063.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 09/17/12 -- SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: WRIT Comment WRITR: WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $18000.96

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $1635.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $400.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $15965.96.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGD: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) OF CHEN AGAINST KENDALL SHETTLESWORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment TUDM: (L) TRACK ASSIGNMENT: UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DRAD1: DAILY RENTAL VALUE $55.33; ADDRESS 2794 DEVONSHIRE AVE REDWOOD CITY CA. 94063; 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0175-CK 171/ 240.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment CUD3: (L) COMPLAINT FILED (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer. Additional Info: Comment 2794 DEVONSHIRE AVE REDWOOD CITY CA94063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Financial info for CHEN, JIN QUAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201208170622 CHEN, JIN QUAN $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Financial info for CHEN, JIN QUAN : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CHEN, JIN QUAN : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270175 CHEN, JIN QUAN $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CHEN, JIN QUAN : Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: CHEN, JIN QUAN; Total Financial Assessment $300.00; Total Payments and Credits $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less