This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 02:45:30 (UTC).

JILL DOE vs. SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 JILL DOE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5839

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE, JILL

Defendants

SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

BOWLER, BARBARA

TOY, JOSEPH

HOLLAND, APRIL

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLARD, B ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

WILSON, JACQUELYN K.

DAVIS, MARK E

HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney as to.

Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: GARY E MOSS New Attorney: JACQUELYN K WILSON Comment Former Attorney: GARY E MOSS New Attorney: JACQUELYN K WILSON

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/07/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Demand For Jury Trial.

Demand For Jury Trial AND NOTICE OF POSTING DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES Comment AND NOTICE OF POSTING DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc..

Proof of Service on CORPORATION LLC, etc. SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCEJ URY Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCEJ URY FEES, NOTICE OF CMC, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, SERVED ON JAY SPAULDING, ASSISTANT SUPERINTENDENT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCEJ URY FE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCEJ URY FEES, NOTICE OF CMC, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO SEAL APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Comment FOR ORDER TO SEAL APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Stipulation & Order.

Stipulation & Order Type: TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATESigned by: JUDG Comment Type: TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE Signed by: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 07/25/2019

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCEJ URY FE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCEJ URY FEES, NOTICE OF CMC, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCE JURY FE Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE RE: NONREFUNDABLE ADVANCE JURY FEES, NOTICE OF CMC, BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, CIVIL TRIAL COURT MANAGEMENT RULES

Order.

Order Type: SEALING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Signed by Comment Type: SEALING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Signed by: JUDGE MIRAM Date Signed: 12/21/18

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Master Calendar - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Stipulation & Order Type: TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATESigned by: JUDG Comment Type: TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE Signed by: JUDGE KARESH Date Signed: 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 11 FOR SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney as to. Additional Info: Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: GARY E MOSS New Attorney: JACQUELYN K WILSON Comment Former Attorney: GARY E MOSS New Attorney: JACQUELYN K WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept. Additional Info: Comment 11 STIP & ORDER TO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Master Calendar to set MSC date accordingly and send notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • Financial: TOY, JOSEPH; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Financial info for SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Financial: SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Financial info for DOE, JILL : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-045412-HOJ CORSIGLIA MCMAHON & ALLARD LLP $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Financial info for DOE, JILL : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Financial info for DOE, JILL : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-082072-HOJ CORSIGLIA MCMAHON AND ALLARD LLP $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Financial info for DOE, JILL : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Financial info for DOE, JILL : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-071097-HOJ ALLARD, B ROBERT $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Financial info for DOE, JILL : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Financial: DOE, JILL; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allard, B. Robert