This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 00:55:31 (UTC).

JESSIE DOMAGAS VS SANDRA YVETT GAYTAN ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 JESSIE DOMAGAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANDRA YVETT GAYTAN ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5851

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JESSIE DOMAGAS

DOMAGAS, JESSIE

Defendants

SANDRA YVETT GUSTAVO

GUSTAVO GAYTAN

GUSTAVO, SANDRA YVETT

GAYTAN, GUSTAVO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HILL, CHARLES E

HILL, CHARLES E, III

 

Court Documents

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: GAYTAN GUSTAVO; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: GUSTAVO, SANDRA YVETT; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: DOMAGAS, JESSIE; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: CMC NOTICE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 121010-0024-XC DEP/ 15.00 PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment ECT: EXONERATE CIVIL TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120808-0264-RP TCI/ 15.00 PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DCT: CIVIL TRUST POSTED BY JESSIE DOMAGAS ON BEHALF OF JESSIE DOMAGAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120808-0258-RP 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY JESSIE DOMAGAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *VODRE: RECEIPT# 120807-0131 VOIDED BY RWILS FROM RKRIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120807-0131-CK OPT/ 450.00 PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DOP: OVERPAYMENT TRUST POSTED BY PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Financial info for DOMAGAS, JESSIE : Case Payment Receipt # 201208080258 DOMAGAS, JESSIE $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Financial info for DOMAGAS, JESSIE : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Financial: DOMAGAS, JESSIE; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less